This case was last updated from PACER on 09/24/2021 at 09:19:30 (UTC).

Dos Santos v. Assurant, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 Dos Santos filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Assurant, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laura Taylor Swain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06368

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Taylor Swain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andreia Rosa Dos Santos

New York, NY 10001-5845

Defendants

Assurant, Inc.

Falcon Shield Property Preservation, LLC

Does 1 through 5

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER: Plaintiff brings this action pro se. By order dated August 17, 2021, Plaintiff was granted thirty days' leave to file a declaration in response to the Court's order to show cause. (ECF 4.) On September 17, 2021, the Court received Plaintiff's request for an extension of time file a declaration. (ECF 5.) The Court grants Plaintiff's request. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff may file a declaration. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/17/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court directs Plaintiff to submit a written declaration, within 30 days, showing cause why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction of Plaintiff's state law claims and any reason why her state law claim is not time-barred. For Plaintiff's convenience, a declaration form is attached to this order. If Plaintiff submits a declaration, it should be labeled with docket number 21-CV-6368 (LTS). No summons shall issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, or if her responses are insufficient, the complaint will be dismissed as set forth in this order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/17/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#5

(#5) LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from A. Dos Santos, dated 9/16/21 re: "ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE" - I write to request an extension of time from the original due date of 9/17/21 to the new deadlind of 10/17/21 to file my Declaration. I ask for this extension because I received the Order to Show Cause one week after I filed; and I need more time to gather information and submit my Declaration. Document filed by Andreia Rosa Dos Santos.(sc) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/30/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/02/2021)

2 #11

Exhibit

2 #10

Exhibit

2 #9

Exhibit

2 #8

Exhibit

2 #7

Exhibit

2 #6

Exhibit

2 #5

Exhibit

2 #4

Exhibit

2 #3

Exhibit

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Exhibit

2 #2

Main Document

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Andreia Rosa Dos Santos.(rdz) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #6 Order 30 Days Other (case opening) to Andreia Rosa Dos Santos at 507 W 28th Street, Apt. 611, New York, NY 10001-5845. (kh) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Plaintiff brings this action pro se. By order dated August 17, 2021, Plaintiff was granted thirty days' leave to file a declaration in response to the Court's order to show cause. (ECF 4.) On September 17, 2021, the Court received Plaintiff's request for an extension of time file a declaration. (ECF 5.) The Court grants Plaintiff's request. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff may file a declaration. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/17/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from A. Dos Santos, dated 9/16/21 re: "ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE" - I write to request an extension of time from the original due date of 9/17/21 to the new deadlind of 10/17/21 to file my Declaration. I ask for this extension because I received the Order to Show Cause one week after I filed; and I need more time to gather information and submit my Declaration. Document filed by Andreia Rosa Dos Santos.(sc) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #4 Order 30 Days Other (case opening) to Andreia Rosa Dos Santos at 507 W 28th Street, Apt. 611, New York, NY 10001-5845. (kh) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court directs Plaintiff to submit a written declaration, within 30 days, showing cause why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction of Plaintiff's state law claims and any reason why her state law claim is not time-barred. For Plaintiff's convenience, a declaration form is attached to this order. If Plaintiff submits a declaration, it should be labeled with docket number 21-CV-6368 (LTS). No summons shall issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, or if her responses are insufficient, the complaint will be dismissed as set forth in this order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/17/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/30/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Assurant, Inc., Does 1 through 5, Falcon Shield Property Preservation, LLC. Document filed by Andreia Rosa Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit).(rdz) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Andreia Rosa Dos Santos.(rdz) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Assurant, Inc. is a litigant