This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/09/2021 at 08:50:13 (UTC).

Dorsey v. Hernandez et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Dorsey filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hernandez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J Juneau and Patrick J Hanna. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-02417

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J Juneau

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward Dorsey

Defendants

Joel Hernandez

Hernandez Brothers Transport, LLC

Trisura Specialty Insurance Company

Hernandez Brothers Transport L L C

Trisura Specialty Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin R Duck

Attorney at Duck Law Firm

5040 Ambassador Caffery Pkwy Ste 200

Lafayette, LA 70508

Defendant Attorneys

Dean M Arruebarrena

Attorney at Leake & Andersson (NO)

1100 Poydras St Ste 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Jason Rhett Bonnet

Attorney at Leake & Anderson

1100 Poydras St Ste 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Marc Edward Devenport

Attorney at Leake & Andersson (NO)

1100 Poydras St Ste 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Megan Ashley Haynes

Attorney at Leake & Andersson (NO)

1100 Poydras St Ste 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Palvin Singh Jhita

Attorney at Leake & Andersson (NO)

1100 Poydras St Ste 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Louis P Bonnaffons

Attorney at Leake & Andersson (NO)

1100 Poydras St Ste 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Misha M Logan

Attorney at Leake & Andersson (NO)

1100 Poydras St Ste 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Robert L Bonnaffons

Attorney at Leake & Andersson (NO)

1100 Poydras St Ste 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Memorandum / Brief

#7

6 #1

Exhibit 1-5

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil cover sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hernandez Brothers Transport L L C. (aty,Arruebarrena, Dean) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #13 Answer to Complaint, sent to Dean M Arruebarrena on behalf of Hernandez Brothers Transport L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/5/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hernandez Brothers Transport L L C.(aty,Arruebarrena, Dean) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC ORDER mooting #7 Motion to Dismiss in light of notice to withdraw at Rec. Doc. 11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/14/2021. (jud,Hanna, Patrick) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss by Hernandez Brothers Transport L L C (aty,Arruebarrena, Dean) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Dorsey. Hernandez Brothers Transport L L C served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (aty,Duck, Kevin) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joel Hernandez, Hernandez Brothers Transport L L C. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joel Hernandez, requested by Edward Dorsey. (aty,Duck, Kevin) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hernandez Brothers Transport L L C, requested by Edward Dorsey. (aty,Duck, Kevin) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Hernandez Brothers Transport, LLC Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 10/14/2021 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Hernandez Brothers Transport, LLC Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) by Hernandez Brothers Transport L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(Attorney Dean M Arruebarrena added to party Hernandez Brothers Transport L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Arruebarrena, Dean) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Trisura Specialty Insurance Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(aty,Arruebarrena, Dean) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trisura Specialty Insurance Co identifying Other Affiliate Trisura Group Ltd for Trisura Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Arruebarrena, Dean) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/12/2021. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/11/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Dean M Arruebarrena on behalf of Trisura Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/25/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Trisura Specialty Insurance Co in in the 16th JDC, Parish of St. Martin. Administrative entry: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St. Martin, Case Number 90454-C (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4770327) filed by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Dean M Arruebarrena added to party Trisura Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Arruebarrena, Dean) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRISURA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Rhett Bonnet

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dean M. Arruebarrena

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Misha M. Logan