This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:27:04 (UTC).

Dorrough Music Publishing Company et al v. Fillmore Entertainment Group L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Dorrough Music Publishing Company filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Fillmore Entertainment Group L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph C. Spero and Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-07063

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joseph C. Spero

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.

Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes

Mouse On Tha Track LLC

Pure Love Music

Naughty Music

Neutral Gray Music

Dorrough Music Publishing

Trill Productions

Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc.

Dorrough Music Publishing Company

Ultra International Music Publishing

Ultra International Music Publishing doing business as Ultra Tunes

Defendants

Lily Nguyen

Fillmore Entertainment Group, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sharon D. Mayo

Cassandra Eva Havens

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#14

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/17/2019
View Court Documents

Docket#Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number. Re: #14 C ertificate of Service, filed by Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Trill Productions, Ultra International Music Publishing, Pure Love Music, Dorrough Music Publishing Company, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2019
View Court Documents

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dorrough Music Publishing Company, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Pure Love Music, Trill Productions, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc. re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #11 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment, #1 Complaint,, #5 Certificate of Interested Entities,, #10 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #9 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination, #7 Summons Issued, #8 Copyright Action (Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Fillmore Entertainment Group, LLC) (Havens, Cassandra) (Filed on 12/16/2019) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2019

(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for February 11, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by February 4th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-07063-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2019
View Court Documents

(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2019
View Court Documents

(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2019
View Court Documents

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dorrough Music Publishing Company.. (Havens, Cassandra) (Filed on 12/2/2019) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2019
View Court Documents

(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 12/3/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2019
View Court Documents

(#8) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2019
View Court Documents

(#7) Summons Issued as to Fillmore Entertainment Group, L.L.C., Lily Nguyen. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2019
View Court Documents

#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #2 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Naughty Mu sic, Neutral Gray Music, Trill Productions, Ultra International Music Publishing, Pure Love Music, Dorrough Music Publishing Company, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc. Document is Proposed Summons. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2019
View Court Documents

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Dorrough Music Publishing Company, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Pure Love Music, Trill Productions, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers for Dorrough Music Publishing, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Pure Love Music, Trill Productions, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. re #1 Complaint, (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/28/2019) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019

(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

(#3) NOTICE by Dorrough Music Publishing Company, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Pure Love Music, Trill Productions, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report On The Filing Or Determination of An Action Or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 11/1/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

(#2) Proposed Summons by Neutral Gray Music, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Pure Love Music, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Dorrough Music Publishing, Trill Productions, Naughty Music as to Fillmore Entertainment Group, L.L.C., Lily Nguyen. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 11/1/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

(#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of the Copyright Act against Fillmore Entertainment Group, L.L.C., Lily Nguyen (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13830693.). Filed by Neutral Gray Music, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Pure Love Music, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Dorrough Music Publishing Company, Trill Productions, Naughty Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 11/1/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less