This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 07:10:58 (UTC).

DORRIS v. WALMART INC

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 DORRIS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WALMART INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00180

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicola Dorris

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

WALMART INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARIE A MATTOX

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

JAMES GARRITY

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorneys

DIANE M LONGORIA

Attorney at QUINTAIROS PRIETO WOOD ETC - PENSACOLA FL

114 E Gregory St, 2Nd Fl

Pensacola, FL 32502

JAMES ANDREW TALBERT

Attorney at QUINTAIROS PRIETO WOOD ETC - PENSACOLA FL

114 E Gregory St, 2Nd Fl

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The discovery deadline is extended to 3/2/2020. The deadline for filing potentially dispositive motions as well as Daubert motions is 25 days after the close of discovery by 3/27/2020. Mediation in this case must be completed on or before a date 28 days after the discovery deadline 3/30/2020. The mediator or parties shall file a report 4/13/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/13/2019. (alb) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (TALBERT, JAMES) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WALMART INC identifying Corporate Parent WALMART INC for WALMART INC.. (LONGORIA, DIANE) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER ON RULE 26(f) OBLIGATIONS. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/1/2019. (alb) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#6

(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/15/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/14/2019. Discovery due by 1/2/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/1/2019. (alb) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

4 #6

Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

4 #5

Notice of Appearance for Defendant

4 #4

Notice of Appearance for Plaintiff

4 #3

Summons Issued

4 #2

Initial Complaint

4 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by WALMART INC. Amendment to #2 Notice (Other) Of Filing Rule 7.2 A Documents (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Initial Complaint, #3 Summons Issued, #4 Notice of Appearance for Plaintiff, #5 Notice of Appearance for Defendant, #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (LONGORIA, DIANE) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS by WALMART INC re #1 Notice of Removal (LONGORIA, DIANE) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

1 #2

Affidavit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART INC from Bay County, case number 2019CA000714. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4536433.), filed by WALMART INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit) (LONGORIA, DIANE) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The discovery deadline is extended to 3/2/2020. The deadline for filing potentially dispositive motions as well as Daubert motions is 25 days after the close of discovery by 3/27/2020. Mediation in this case must be completed on or before a date 28 days after the discovery deadline 3/30/2020. The mediator or parties shall file a report 4/13/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/13/2019. (alb) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (TALBERT, JAMES) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WALMART INC identifying Corporate Parent WALMART INC for WALMART INC.. (LONGORIA, DIANE) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Scheduling Order. (No Corporate Disclosure Statement filed.) (alb) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER ON RULE 26(f) OBLIGATIONS. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/1/2019. (alb) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/15/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/14/2019. Discovery due by 1/2/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/1/2019. (alb) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (See proposed ISO.) (alb) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • (#5) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by WALMART INC. Amendment to #2 Notice (Other) Of Filing Rule 7.2 A Documents (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Initial Complaint, #3 Summons Issued, #4 Notice of Appearance for Plaintiff, #5 Notice of Appearance for Defendant, #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (LONGORIA, DIANE) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK added. (erl) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by WALMART INC. (LONGORIA, DIANE) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS by WALMART INC re #1 Notice of Removal (LONGORIA, DIANE) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART INC from Bay County, case number 2019CA000714. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4536433.), filed by WALMART INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit) (LONGORIA, DIANE) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less