This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 09:52:40 (UTC).

Dorn v. Vivint, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Dorn filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Vivint, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gray M. Borden, Myron H. Thompson and Stephen Michael Doyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00258

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

Referral Judges

Gray M. Borden

Stephen Michael Doyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiffany Dorn

Defendant

Vivint, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Stephen Mann

Attorney at Pittman Dutton & Hellums, P.C.

2001 Park Place Tower - Ste 1100

Birmingham, AL 35203

Austin Brock Whitten

Attorney at Pittman Dutton & Hellums PC

2001 Park Place N - Ste 1100

Birmingham, AL 35203

Michael Cory Bradley

Attorney at Pittman Dutton & Hellums PC

2001 Park Place North, Suite 1100

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Brent Tompkins

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jonathan Hoffmann

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP

1901 Sixth Ave N - Ste 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

Joseph Dennis Leavens

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP

P.O. Box 306

Birmingham, AL 35201

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Vivint, Inc. with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Vacant, Unable to Forward". (alm, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

6 #1

Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment

#2

(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tiffany Dorn. (alm, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the plf has until 6/14/2019, to amend the complaint to allege subject-matter jurisdiction properly. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/31/2019. (alm, ) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Whitten, Austin) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#10

(#10) FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Vivint, Inc., filed by Tiffany Dorn.(Mann, Jonathan) Modified on 6/14/2019 to clarify the docket text (kr, ). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

1 #2

Receipt

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vivint, Inc..(Tompkins, Jason) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Vivint, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (alm, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Vivint, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602053178), filed by Tiffany Dorn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(alm, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#12

(#12) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020, in chambers in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 5/1/2020; Mediation Notice due by 4/10/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2019; Discovery due by 3/27/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/10/2019. (Furn: Calendar, AG)(kr, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Vivint, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Vivint, Inc. re #6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Tompkins, Jason) Modified on 6/7/2019 to add the link to the #6 Notice (alm, ). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#8

(#8) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/7/2019. (alm, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020, in chambers in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 5/1/2020; Mediation Notice due by 4/10/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2019; Discovery due by 3/27/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/10/2019. (Furn: Calendar, AG)(kr, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Whitten, Austin) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Vivint, Inc., filed by Tiffany Dorn.(Mann, Jonathan) Modified on 6/14/2019 to clarify the docket text (kr, ). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Vivint, Inc. re #6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Tompkins, Jason) Modified on 6/7/2019 to add the link to the #6 Notice (alm, ). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/7/2019. (alm, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the plf has until 6/14/2019, to amend the complaint to allege subject-matter jurisdiction properly. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/31/2019. (alm, ) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Vivint, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PURSUANT TO THE #5 ANSWER - ***Attorney Joseph Dennis Leavens & Jonathan Hoffmann for Vivint, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vivint, Inc..(Tompkins, Jason) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Vivint, Inc. with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Vacant, Unable to Forward". (alm, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Vivint, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (alm, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tiffany Dorn. (alm, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tiffany Dorn. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Vivint, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602053178), filed by Tiffany Dorn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(alm, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.