This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:16:13 (UTC).

Doria v. Sunrun Incorporated

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Doria filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Sunrun Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Diane J Humetewa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05643

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diane J Humetewa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel T Doria

Scottsdale, AZ 85254

Defendants

Sunrun Inc.

Sunrun Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Michael B Moore

Attorney at Arena Hoffman LLP

220 Montgomery St., Ste. 905

San Francisco, CA 94104

Ronald D Arena

Attorney at Arena Hoffman LLP

220 Montgomery St., Ste. 905

San Francisco, CA 94104

Conor D Mack

Attorney at Arena Hoffman LLP

220 Montgomery St., Ste. 905

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX214115 filed by Daniel T Doria. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

(#4) DECLARATION of of Daniel T Doria in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Daniel T Doria. (MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Daniel T Doria. (MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of of Daniel T Doria in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Daniel T Doria. (MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel T Doria. (MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#6

(#23) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel T Doria. Reason for return: Unable to Forward. Document number #6 #7 #8 . (MSA) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#7

(#23) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel T Doria. Reason for return: Unable to Forward. Document number #6 #7 #8 . (MSA) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#28

(#28) Document was filed in the wrong case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 01/09/2020 (CEI) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#27

(#27) ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 4/2/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/8/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#26

(#26) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daniel T Doria: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 1/6/2020 to Ronald D. Arena Esq. Counsel for Defendant. (Doria, Daniel T) *Modified on 1/7/2020 to correct date waiver was sent (SST). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#25

(#25) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel T Doria. Reason for return: Not Deliverable as Addressed. Document number #12 . (MSA) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#12

(#25) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel T Doria. Reason for return: Not Deliverable as Addressed. Document number #12 . (MSA) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#24

(#24) ORDER denying Plaintiff's #15 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/12/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#15

(#24) ORDER denying Plaintiff's #15 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/12/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#23

(#23) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel T Doria. Reason for return: Unable to Forward. Document number #6 #7 #8 . (MSA) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#22

(#22) Summons Reissued as to Sunrun Incorporated. *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (GMP) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Document was filed in the wrong case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 01/09/2020 (CEI) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 4/2/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/8/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ronald D Arena, Michael B Moore, and Conor D Mack on behalf of Defendant Sunrun Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daniel T Doria: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 1/6/2020 to Ronald D. Arena Esq. Counsel for Defendant. (Doria, Daniel T) *Modified on 1/7/2020 to correct date waiver was sent (SST). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel T Doria. Reason for return: Not Deliverable as Addressed. Document number #12 . (MSA) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER denying Plaintiff's #15 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/12/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel T Doria. Reason for return: Unable to Forward. Document number #6 #7 #8 . (MSA) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Summons Reissued as to Sunrun Incorporated. *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (GMP) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel T Doria. Reason for return: Return to Sender-Unable to Forward. Document number 10. (GMP) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/3/19. (SLQ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Sunrun Inc.. (MSA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/18/19. (CLB) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX214115. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-05643-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel T Doria. (MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION of of Daniel T Doria in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Daniel T Doria. (MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Daniel T Doria. (MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EX PARTE MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Daniel T Doria. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX214115 filed by Daniel T Doria. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MSA) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.