This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2020 at 14:10:53 (UTC).

Dorgan et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Dorgan filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Roseann Ketchmark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00529

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roseann Ketchmark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Madenna K. Dorgan

Richard Dorgan

Defendants

Ethicon Women's Health and Urology

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

American Medical Systems, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Gynecare

American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.

Ethicon, LLC

Endo Health Solutions, Inc

Ethicon, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas P. Cartmell

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Melanie H. Muhlstock

Attorney at Parker Waichman Alonso, LLP

111 Great Neck Road

Great Neck, NY 11021

Jeffrey M. Kuntz

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Brian J. Madden

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Raymond C Silverman

Attorney at Parker Waichman LLP

6 Harbor Park Drive

Port Washington, NY 11050

Jerrold S. Parker

Attorney at Parker Waichman Alonso, LLP

111 Great Neck Road

Great Neck, NY 11021

Defendant Attorneys

Erik W. Legg

Attorney at FARRELL WHITE & LEGG

P. O. Box 6457

Huntington, WV 25772-6457

Michael J. Farrell

Attorney at FARRELL WHITE & LEGG

P. O. Box 6457

Huntington, WV 25772-6457

Barbara R. Binis

Attorney at REED SMITH

Three Logan Square, Suite 3100, 1717 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

William M. Gage

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Daniel R. Higginbotham

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338

Susan M. Robinson

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Philip J. Combs

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Kari L. Sutherland

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 1138

Oxford, MS 38655

Aaron N. Arthur

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

David B Thomas

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann

P.O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Christy D. Jones

Attorney at Butler, Snow, O'Mara, Stevens & Cannada, PLLC

P.O. Box 2567, 17Th Fl. - Deposit Guaranty Plaza

Jackson, MS 39225-2567

Laura H. Dixon

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Charissa N. Walker

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Cicely I Lubben

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP - StL

100 South 4Th Street, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63102

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#136

#135

#132

131 #1

Exhibit 1

#131

#128

#125

85 #1

Exhibit A - H

#85

5 #7

Summons - Johnson & Johnson

5 #6

Summons - Ethicon LLC

5 #4

Summons - Endo Pharm

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

337 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #85 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment Based Upon Bankruptcy Judicial Estoppel : Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon Judicial Estoppel filed by Cicely I Lubben on behalf of Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Related document(s) #85 ) (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) Minute Entry. Telephone status conference held in chambers by telephone before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark on 8/10/2020. Counsel appearing for Plaintiffs: Brian Madden and Luke Callahan. Counsel appearing for Defendants: Cicely Lubben and Rita Maimbourg. Discussions included the pending motions before the Court, supplemental discovery, and potential mediation. As ruled on the record: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file supplemental suggestions in opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment based on bankruptcy judicial estoppel is GRANTED. (Doc. #131 .) The brief attached to Plaintiffs' motion (Doc. [131-1]) is DEEMED FILED this date. Defendants may file a reply in support of their motion by 9/1/2020. The parties are also directed to submit a joint proposed scheduling order by 9/1/2020. Time in court: 4:00 p.m. to 4:18 p.m.. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Jean Crawford, 816-512-5642, jean_crawford@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Phillips, Caleb) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#133) ORDER granting #132 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Rita Ann Maimbourg for Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) Motion to allow Rita A. Maimbourg to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6980329) filed by Scott Richard Hunsaker on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Hunsaker, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) MOTION for leave to file Supplemental Suggestions in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Bankruptcy Judicial Estoppel filed by Brian J. Madden on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Madden, Brian) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#130) NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/10/2020 04:00 PM in Chambers by telephone before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Dollar, Jordan) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) ORDER granting Defendants' #128 motion to withdraw attorneys. Good cause exists to allow the requested withdrawals, as co-counsel continue to represent Defendants. Attorneys William M. Gage; Daniel R. Higginbotham; Christy D. Jones; Susan M. Robinson; Kari L. Sutherland; David B. Thomas; Aaron N. Arthur; and Philip J. Combs terminated. Signed on 7/16/2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Phillips, Caleb) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) MOTION to withdraw as attorney Aaron N. Arthur, Daniel R. Higginbotham, David B. Thomas, Philip J. Combs and Susan M. Robinson of Thomas Combs & Spann PLLC, Christy D. Jones, Kari L. Sutherland, Laura H. Dixon and William M. Gage of Butler Snow LLP filed by Scott Richard Hunsaker on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hunsaker, Scott) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) ORDER granting #125 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Cicely I Lubben for Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Erik W. Legg on behalf of American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Legg, Erik) [Transferred from wvsd on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 10/31/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from wvsd on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Richard Dorgan, Madenna K. Dorgan for American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, re: #4 Amended Short Form Complaint - Ethicon, Inc., returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies for each defendant returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (tmh) [Transferred from wvsd on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 10/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS TO BE REISSUED SUBMITTED by Madenna K. Dorgan, Richard Dorgan for Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., re: #4 First Amended Short Form Complaint - Ethicon, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Summons - AMS, #2 Summons - Endo Health, #3 Summons - Endo Holdings, #4 Summons - Endo Pharm, #5 Summons - Ethicon Inc, #6 Summons - Ethicon LLC, #7 Summons - Johnson & Johnson)(Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from wvsd on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 10/08/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Madenna K. Dorgan, Richard Dorgan against Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, American Medical Systems, Inc. ("AMS"), American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc. ("AMS Holdings"), Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc. (f/k/a Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.). (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from wvsd on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 10/08/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Madenna K. Dorgan, Richard Dorgan for American Medical Systems, Inc., Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon, Inc., Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies for each defendant returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (tmh) [Transferred from wvsd on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/16/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER 10 (Lifting Stay on Discovery) entered on 06/14/2012 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/13/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-1907011. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tmh) [Transferred from wvsd on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 07/13/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Women's Health and Urology is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant