This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/13/2021 at 06:59:19 (UTC).

Doral Isles Station Inc. v. Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Doral Isles Station Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul C. Huck. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-22936

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul C. Huck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Doral Isles Station Inc.

Defendant

Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Fuxa

Attorney at Geyer Fuxa Tyler

490 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway, Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33325

Gilberto Justino Barreto

Attorney at Geyer, Fuxa, Tyler PLLC

5246 Sw 8Th St, Suite 207

Miami, FL 33134

Jeremy Fenton Tyler

Attorney at Geyer Fuxa Tyler

490 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway, Ste 110

Sunrise, FL 33325

Wayne Wyndham Geyer, Jr.

Attorney at Geyer Fuxa Tyler

490 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway, Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33325

Defendant Attorneys

Holly S. Harvey

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd., Ste 4Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Jorge Alexander Maza

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd., Ste 4Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Initial Disclosure(s) by Doral Isles Station Inc. (Tyler, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#9

(#9) Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement & Certificate of Interested Persons by Doral Isles Station Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Latin Trust Financial, LLC for Doral Isles Station Inc. (Barreto, Gilberto) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Fairfax (US) Inc., Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Company for Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company (Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING CIVIL JURY TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 3/28/2022 in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck., Calendar Call set for 3/23/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 8/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Text Modified on 8/18/2021 (scn). (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Fairfax (US) Inc., Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd. a Canadian company, Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Company for Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company (Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#4

(#4) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company (Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#3

(#3) CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial Disclosure(s) by Doral Isles Station Inc. (Tyler, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement & Certificate of Interested Persons by Doral Isles Station Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Latin Trust Financial, LLC for Doral Isles Station Inc. (Barreto, Gilberto) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Fairfax (US) Inc., Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Company for Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company (Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING CIVIL JURY TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 3/28/2022 in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck., Calendar Call set for 3/23/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 8/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Text Modified on 8/18/2021 (scn). (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Fairfax (US) Inc., Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd. a Canadian company, Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Company for Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company (Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (scn) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company (Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Maza, Jorge) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14922484, filed by Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(Maza, Jorge) Modified on 8/12/2021 (jao). (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holly S. Harvey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jorge Alexander Maza