This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2020 at 08:42:36 (UTC).

Doolittle v. Smith et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 Doolittle filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00034

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doolittle

Angola, LA 70712

Defendants

Unknown Blackmore

Carl Smith

Unknown Mitchell

Unknown Turner

Unknown Tilliary

Unknown Trent

Thomas Sterling

Unknown Ashley

Jimmy Smith

Unknown Demars

Charles Gooden

Unknown Sanders

Unknown Jones

Unknown Juno

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by John Doolittle. (KMW) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEAL of #4 Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner), by John Doolittle. (KMW) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The plaintiff is granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order within which to pay $400.00, the full amount of the Courts filing fee. Filing Fee due by 3/24/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 03/03/2020. (KMW) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

3 #1

Local Rule 5

#3

(#3) Letter to John Doolittle Re: Future Compliance with Local Rule 5(d)(1) (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 5) (KMW) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by John Doolittle. (KMW) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Unknown Ashley, Unknown Blackmore, Unknown Demars, Charles Gooden, Unknown Jones, Unknown Juno, Unknown Mitchell, Unknown Sanders, Carl Smith, Jimmy Smith, Thomas Sterling, Unknown Tilliary, Unknown Trent, Unknown Turner, filed by John Doolittle.(KMW) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by John Doolittle. (KMW) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEAL of #4 Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner), by John Doolittle. (KMW) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The plaintiff is granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order within which to pay $400.00, the full amount of the Courts filing fee. Filing Fee due by 3/24/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 03/03/2020. (KMW) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to John Doolittle Re: Future Compliance with Local Rule 5(d)(1) (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 5) (KMW) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by John Doolittle. (KMW) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Unknown Ashley, Unknown Blackmore, Unknown Demars, Charles Gooden, Unknown Jones, Unknown Juno, Unknown Mitchell, Unknown Sanders, Carl Smith, Jimmy Smith, Thomas Sterling, Unknown Tilliary, Unknown Trent, Unknown Turner, filed by John Doolittle.(KMW) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less