This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:47:16 (UTC).

Dooley v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Dooley filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barry A. Bryant and Susan O. Hickey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06138

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barry A. Bryant

Presiding Judge

Susan O. Hickey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Rene' Dooley

Defendant

Social Security Administration Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew F. Golden

Attorney at Matthew Golden Law Firm, PLLC

723 Main Street

Texarkana, TX 75501

Defendant Attorneys

Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas

Attorney at OGCSSAR4

Linda H Green

Attorney at Social Security Administration

1301 Young Str., Ste A702

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; granting #3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 5, 2019. (lw) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Linda H Green on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Green, Linda) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketTEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Susan O. Hickey and Honorable Barry A. Bryant, as the referral judge. (lw) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; granting #3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 5, 2019. (lw) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Reassignment Form)(lw) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Angela Rene' Dooley. (Golden, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Angela Rene' Dooley.(Golden, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Angela Rene' Dooley. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lw) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less