This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/12/2020 at 07:09:35 (UTC).

DONOVAN REALTY, LLC et al v. CAMPERS INN HOLDING CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 DONOVAN REALTY, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAMPERS INN HOLDING CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is PETRESE B. TUCKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03954

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETRESE B. TUCKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

DERWOOD L LITTLEFIELD

ZERTECK, INC.

DD&A TILDEN REALTY, LLC

TILDEN RECREATIONAL VEHICLES, INC.

DONOVAN REALTY, LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

CI OF WEST COXSACKIE, LLC

CAMPERS INN HOLDING CORPORATION

CI OF HAMBURG, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

PAIGE M. WILLAN

Attorney at KLEHR HARRISON HARVEY BRANZBURG LLP

1835 Market St Ste 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

STEPHANIE M. GREY

Attorney at KLEHR HARRISON HARVEY BRANZBURG LLP

1835 Market Street, 14Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JORDAN M. RAND

Attorney at KLEHR HARRISON HARVEY BRANZBURG

1835 Market Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

JAMES T. SMITH

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

One Logan Square, 130 N 18Th St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOEL MICHEL

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

One Logan Square, 130 N 18Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

WILLIAM R. CRUSE

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

One Logan Square, 130 North 18Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#24

23 #2

Text of Proposed Order

23 #1

Exhibit A

#23

22 #1

Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Law

#22

15 #4

Exhibit 2

15 #3

Exhibit 1

15 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE M. GREY on behalf of DD&A TILDEN REALTY, LLC, DONOVAN REALTY, LLC, DERWOOD L LITTLEFIELD, TILDEN RECREATIONAL VEHICLES, INC., ZERTECK, INC. with Certificate of Service(GREY, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by DD&A TILDEN REALTY, LLC, DONOVAN REALTY, LLC, DERWOOD L LITTLEFIELD, TILDEN RECREATIONAL VEHICLES, INC., ZERTECK, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WILLAN, PAIGE) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Plaintiffs/Counterclaim-Defendants filed by CAMPERS INN HOLDING CORPORATION, CI OF HAMBURG, LLC, CI OF WEST COXSACKIE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Law)(MICHEL, JOEL) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE in Support re #10 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by CAMPERS INN HOLDING CORPORATION, CI OF HAMBURG, LLC, CI OF WEST COXSACKIE, LLC. (MICHEL, JOEL) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO SUBMIT REVISIONS TO THE PROPOSED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY ORDER AND A REPLY BRIEF BY 5:00 ON 9/8/20 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 9/4/20. 9/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER THAT REQUEST IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS SHALL SUBMIT REVISIONS TO THE PROPOSED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY ORDER AND A REPLY BRIEF (DOC. 10) BY 5:00 PM ON 9/8/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 9/4/20. 9/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. 9) SHALL BE EXTENDED FROM 9/8/20 UNTIL SUCH TIME AS DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS SUBMISSION IS DUE FOLLOWING THE CLOSE OF THE EXPEDITED DISCOVERY IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 9/4/20. 9/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Support re #10 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by DD&A TILDEN REALTY, LLC, DONOVAN REALTY, LLC, DERWOOD L LITTLEFIELD, TILDEN RECREATIONAL VEHICLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(RAND, JORDAN) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE by DD&A TILDEN REALTY, LLC, DONOVAN REALTY, LLC, DERWOOD L LITTLEFIELD, TILDEN RECREATIONAL VEHICLES, INC.. (RAND, JORDAN)*FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 9/8/2020 (lisad, ). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by DD&A TILDEN REALTY, LLC, DONOVAN REALTY, LLC, DERWOOD L LITTLEFIELD, TILDEN RECREATIONAL VEHICLES, INC., ZERTECK, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(RAND, JORDAN) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CAMPERS INN HOLDING CORPORATION, CI OF HAMBURG, LLC, CI OF WEST COXSACKIE, LLC.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SMITH, JAMES) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint together with and Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CI OF WEST COXSACKIE, LLC, CAMPERS INN HOLDING CORPORATION, CI OF HAMBURG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(SMITH, JAMES) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL MICHEL on behalf of CAMPERS INN HOLDING CORPORATION, CI OF HAMBURG, LLC, CI OF WEST COXSACKIE, LLC with Certificate of Service(MICHEL, JOEL) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES T. SMITH on behalf of CAMPERS INN HOLDING CORPORATION, CI OF HAMBURG, LLC, CI OF WEST COXSACKIE, LLC with Certificate of Service(SMITH, JAMES) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to CAMPERS INN HOLDING CORPORATION, CI OF HAMBURG, LLC, CI OF WEST COXSACKIE, LLC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 8/13/20 (JL ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TILDEN RECREATIONAL VEHICLES, INC..(WILLAN, PAIGE) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ZERTECK, INC..(WILLAN, PAIGE) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by DD&A TILDEN REALTY, LLC.(WILLAN, PAIGE) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by DONOVAN REALTY, LLC.(WILLAN, PAIGE) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14492931.), filed by ZERTECK, INC., DD&A TILDEN REALTY, LLC, DONOVAN REALTY, LLC, TILDEN RECREATIONAL VEHICLES, INC., DERWOOD L LITTLEFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(WILLAN, PAIGE) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tilden Recreational Vehicles Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where D.D. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JORDAN M. RAND

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paige Willan