This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2022 at 09:13:01 (UTC).

Donovan et al v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 Donovan filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against T-Mobile USA Inc Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4 21-md-3019. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00888

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Deirdre C Donovan

Beth Byrd

Kevin Curran

Allan Spielman

Defendant

T-Mobile USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beth E Terrell

Attorney at TERRELL MARSHALL LAW GROUP PLLC

936 N 34Th St, Ste 300

Seattle, WA 98103-8869

Defendant Attorneys

Kristine McAlister Brown

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD LLP (GA)

1201 W Peachtree St, One Atlantic Ctr

Atlanta, GA 30309-3432

Kathleen M O'Sullivan

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Lauren Jeffers Tsuji

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Steve Y Koh

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

15 #1

*Restricted*

15 #15

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

14 #1

CTO email

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING JPML'S RULING ON TRANSFER re Parties' #12 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#12

(#12) Stipulated MOTION and Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#10

(#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7251490 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiffs Beth Byrd, Kevin Curran, Deirdre C Donovan, Allan Spielman. (Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#4

(#4) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #3 Summons Issued by Plaintiffs Beth Byrd, Kevin Curran, Deirdre C Donovan, Allan Spielman (Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) (attorney name incorrect, filer will refile corrected summons for reissuance. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 8/30/2021. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

1 #2

Summons

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01138. (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING JPML'S RULING ON TRANSFER re Parties' #12 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorneys Kathleen M O'Sullivan and Lauren Jeffers Tsuji added for T-Mobile USA Inc; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Stipulated MOTION and Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(STP) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7251490 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein as related to C21-1119BJR. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. (KERR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiffs Beth Byrd, Kevin Curran, Deirdre C Donovan, Allan Spielman. (Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #3 Summons Issued by Plaintiffs Beth Byrd, Kevin Curran, Deirdre C Donovan, Allan Spielman (Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) (attorney name incorrect, filer will refile corrected summons for reissuance. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 8/30/2021. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketJudge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7220189) Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Beth Byrd(pty:pla), Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Kevin Curran(pty:pla), Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Deirdre C Donovan(pty:pla), Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Allan Spielman(pty:pla), filed by Allan Spielman, Deirdre C Donovan, Kevin Curran, Beth Byrd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from wawd on 12/21/2021.] (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less