This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2021 at 18:41:11 (UTC).

Donoghue et al v. Nostro et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Donoghue filed an Other lawsuit against Nostro. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark W. Pedersen and Elizabeth A. Wolford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-06100

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark W. Pedersen

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth A. Wolford

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Premium Mortgage Corporation

160 Linden Oaks, Suite E

Rochester, NY 14625

Michael Donoghue

Rochester, NY 14625

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Everett Financial, Inc. d/b/a Supreme Lending

Cynthia Nostro

David Popham

Dylan Randall

Everett Financial, Inc.

Everett Financial, Inc. doing business as Supreme Lending

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Sharon P. Stiller

Attorney at Abrams Fensterman Fensterman Eisman Formato

160 Linden Oaks, Suite E

Rochester, NY 14625

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jeremy M. Sher

Attorney at Adams Leclair LLP

28 East Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

Anna S.M. McCarthy

Attorney at Harter, Secrest and Emery LLP

50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1000

Buffalo, NY 14202-2293

Jeffrey J. Calabrese

Attorney at Harter, Secrest & Emery LLP

1600 Bausch & Lomb Place

Rochester, NY 14604-2711

Daniel James Altieri

Attorney at Harter, Secrest and Emery LLP

50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1000

Buffalo, NY 14202-2293

Steven E. Cole

Attorney at Adams Leclair LLP

28 East Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

 

Court Documents

#32

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

25 #1

Certificate of Service

#25

#22

#5

#4

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Documents

1 #1

Index to Notice of Removal

#1

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) SCHEDULING/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 6/7/2021. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Discovery completed by 9/30/2021. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 10/29/2021. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 12/15/2021. If no experts are identified by Plaintiff, then dispositivemMotions due by 11/29/2021. If there are experts identified, then dispositive motions will be due 3/4/22.. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 4/7/21. (KAP) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#31) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen: Scheduling Conference held on 4/7/2021. Appearances: Sharon P. Stiller, Esq. by phone; Maureen Bass, Esq. by phone; Jeffrey J. Calabrese, Esq. by video; Steven E. Cole, Esq. by video; Anna S.M. McCarthy, Esq. by video; Jeremy M. Sher, Esq. by video. Scheduling Order to be issued. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (JB) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2021 11:00 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. A joint proposed discovery plan is due to be filed at least 4 business days prior to the conference. The matter will take place via Zoom. Counsel of record will receive connection information from the Court within 24 hours of the proceeding. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 3/19/2021. (JB) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DISCOVERY PLAN by Everett Financial, Inc..(Sher, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 10/29/20. (KAP) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Mediation Certification by Harold A. Kurland. Not settled, mediation complete. (AGW) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Everett Financial, Inc.. (Cole, Steven) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KM) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premium Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stiller, Sharon) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #22 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Michael Donoghue, Premium Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stiller, Sharon) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER, Answer due date updated to March 2, 2020 as to all defendants. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 2/24/2020. (TF) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cynthia Nostro, David Popham, Dylan Randall re #4 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (Calabrese, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Cole on behalf of Everett Financial, Inc. (Cole, Steven) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Cynthia Nostro, David Popham, Dylan Randall. (Calabrese, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LMD) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (LMD) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (LMD) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Calabrese on behalf of Cynthia Nostro, David Popham, Dylan Randall (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Calabrese, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION signed by Jeremy Sher re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Everett Financial, Inc. d/b/a Supreme Lending Certificate of Service. (Sher, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Monroe County Supreme Court, case number E2020000167. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3740364), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index to Notice of Removal, #2 Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sher, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Premium Mortgage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Everett Financial, Inc d/b/a Supreme Lending is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey J. Calabrese