Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2021 at 18:12:14 (UTC).

Donna Louise Williams et al v. County of Los Angeles et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Donna Louise Williams filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Los Angeles. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03068

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE ESTATE OF FRED WILLIAMS III

FRED WILLIAMS JR., an individual

DONNA LOUISE WILLIAMS, individually and as Successor-in-Interest to THE ESTATE OF FRED WILLIAMS III

Fred Williams Jr.

Donna Louise Williams

Defendants

SHERIFF ALEX VILLANUEVA, in his individual and official capacities

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal entity

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT, a municipal entity

DOES 1-50, Inclusive,

Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department

Sheriff Alex Villanueva

DOES 1-50, inclusive

County of Los Angeles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian D Witzer

Attorney at Law Offices of Brian D. Witzer

2393 Venus Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90046

Kenneth J Melrose

Attorney at Law Offices of Brian Witzer Inc

2393 Venus Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90046

Eric C Canton

Attorney at Law Offices of Brian Witzer Inc

2393 Venus Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90046

Defendant Attorneys

Antonio K Kizzie

Attorney at Ivie McNeill Wyatt Purcell and Diggs APLC

444 South Flower Street Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Rickey Ivie

Attorney at Ivie McNeill Wyatt Purcell and Diggs

444 South Flower Street Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Fred Williams Jr.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Witzer, Brian) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#7

(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal entity, SHERIFF ALEX VILLANUEVA, in his individual and official capacities, (Kizzie, Antonio) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal entity, SHERIFF ALEX VILLANUEVA, in his individual and official capacities. (Kizzie, Antonio) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV10906 Receipt No: ACACDC-31074834 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants SHERIFF ALEX VILLANUEVA, in his individual and official capacities, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal entity. (Attorney Antonio K Kizzie added to party COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal entity(pty:dft), Attorney Antonio K Kizzie added to party SHERIFF ALEX VILLANUEVA, in his individual and official capacities(pty:dft))(Kizzie, Antonio) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Fred Williams Jr.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Witzer, Brian) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Donna Louise Williams, Fred Williams Jr., The Estate of Fred Williams III in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/22/2021, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal entity, SHERIFF ALEX VILLANUEVA, in his individual and official capacities, (Kizzie, Antonio) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal entity, SHERIFF ALEX VILLANUEVA, in his individual and official capacities. (Kizzie, Antonio) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV10906 Receipt No: ACACDC-31074834 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants SHERIFF ALEX VILLANUEVA, in his individual and official capacities, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal entity. (Attorney Antonio K Kizzie added to party COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal entity(pty:dft), Attorney Antonio K Kizzie added to party SHERIFF ALEX VILLANUEVA, in his individual and official capacities(pty:dft))(Kizzie, Antonio) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where : LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT TASKFORCE FOR REGIONAL AUTOTHEFT PREVENTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rickey Ivie

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antonio K Kizzie