This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2019 at 07:10:55 (UTC).

Donna Connary v. Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 Donna Connary filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julie A. Robinson and Teresa J. James. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02327

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

Referral Judge

Teresa J. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donna Connary

Defendants

Colgate-Palmolive Company

Hills Pet Nutrition Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Blakeman

Attorney at Blakeman Law

611 Wilshire Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Donna Connary Third Amended (Blakeman, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

19 #2

Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines

19 #1

Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order

#19

(#19) LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

18 #1

*Restricted*

#18

(#18) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 5:19-cv-00913. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#17

(#17) Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2887, transferring case to USDC, District of Kansas and assigned to Honorable Julie A Robinson. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. upon Colgate-Palmolive Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Hannah Chanoine. (Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. upon Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Hannah Chanoine. (Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. (Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#1

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. See #20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Notice of Voluntary Dismissal also filed in MDL 2887, document 30. (gw) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Donna Connary Third Amended (Blakeman, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 5:19-cv-00913. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2887, transferring case to USDC, District of Kansas and assigned to Honorable Julie A Robinson. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. upon Colgate-Palmolive Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Hannah Chanoine. (Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. upon Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Hannah Chanoine. (Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-04248 PSG(SKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani and Judge John A. Kronstadt to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00913 PSG(SKx). Signed by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. See order for details. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Other Filings - select - Notices - select - Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. Other error(s) with document(s): The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall take notice of the CM/ECF procedures. Any future document will be stricken for failure to follow the procedures. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. (Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. (Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23750790 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Donna Connary. (Attorney Benjamin Blakeman added to party Donna Connary(pty:pla))(Blakeman, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.] (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.