This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/20/2022 at 08:08:17 (UTC).

Dong v. Cloopen Group Holding Limited et al

Case Summary

On December 10, 2021, Boyan Dong (“Plaintiff”), individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, represented by Ralph M. Stone of Stone Law Group PLLC, filed a class action lawsuit against Cloopen Group Holding Limited (“Cloopen” or the “Company” or “Defendants”), seeking damages and injunctive relief for the alleged fraud and misleading statements made regarding the IPO. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Southern District of New York. 

Plaintiff brought this action as a class action pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 23(a) and (b)(3) on behalf of a class consisting of all persons who purchased or otherwise acquired Cloopen ADSs pursuant and/or traceable to the Registration Statement and/or purchased or otherwise acquired Cloopen securities between the Class Period, and who were damaged thereby (the “Class”).

In the complaint Plaintiff alleged that, “Cloopen claims to be the largest multi-capability cloud-based communications solution provider in China. The Company purportedly is the only Chinese provider that offers a full suite of cloud-based communications solutions covering communications platform as a service (CPaaS), cloud-based contact centers (cloud-based CC), and cloud-based unified communications and collaborations (cloud-based UC&C). In its February 2021 U.S. IPO, Cloopen sold 23 million ADSs (including the full exercise of the Underwriter Defendants’ over-allotment option) at $16 per ADS, netting approximately $342 million in proceeds from the offering.”

Plaintiff further alleged that, “the Registration Statement contained materially false and misleading statements of fact and failed to disclose facts required to be disclosed therein regarding Cloopen’s business, operations, and prospects. The Registration Statement led Cloopen ADS purchasers to believe that the Company’s much-touted growth strategy, which relied upon cross-selling, up-selling, optimizing existing solutions, and developing new features, was effective. In fact, Cloopen’s growth strategy was not working and its existing customers were abandoning the Company. The Company’s net retention rate had dropped well below the 94.7% rate reported for the nine months ended September 30, 2020.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “Cloopen’s Registration Statement further failed to disclose that an increasing number of its customers were refusing to pay, forcing the Company to record massive increases in its accounts receivables and allowance for doubtful accounts. On March 26, 2021, just over six weeks after its IPO, Cloopen shocked the market when it published its 4Q 2020 and FY 2020 financial results, which closed on December 31, 2020, more than a month before the IPO. In response to this shocking news, the price of Cloopen’s ADSs fell 18.5%, dropping from $14.42 per ADS on March 25, 2021 to $11.75 per ADS on March 26, 2021. Yet, even then, Cloopen’s most senior officers continued to make materially false and misleading statements to the market and failed to reveal the true extent of Cloopen’s troubles.”

There are four claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff. The first claim deals with alleged violations of  § 11 of the Securities Act against All Defendants, the second and third claims deal with alleged violations of § 15 of the Securities Act and of § 10(b) of the Exchange Act and Rule 10b-5, respectively. The last claim deals with alleged violation of § 20(a) of the Exchange Act. 

In her prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court for awarding compensatory damages in favor of Plaintiff and the other class members, rescission or a rescissory measure of damages, and an award of such equitable/injunctive or other relief as deemed appropriate by the Court.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10610

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boyan Dong

Defendants

Cloopen Group Holding Limited

Changxun Sun

Yipeng Li

Kui Zhou

Qingsheng Zheng

Xiaodong Liang

Zi Yang

Ming Liao

Feng Zhu

Lok Yan Hui

Jianhong Zhou

Ching Chiu

Xiegang Xiong

Cheng Luo

Yunhao Liu

COGENCY GLOBAL INC.

Colleen A. Devries

Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C.

Citigroup Global Markets Inc.

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Ira Fistel, Jr.

Attorney at Johnson Fistel, LLP

40 Powder Springs St.

Marietta, GA 30064

Ralph M. Stone

Attorney at Stone Law Group PLLC

1700 Broadway, Ste 4100

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Ignacio E. Salceda

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati (CA)

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Sheryl Shapiro Bassin

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati (NYC)

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Fl

New York, NY 10019

Joanna Andrea Diakos

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP (NYC)

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022-6030

Todd G. Cosenza

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP (NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Charles Dean Cording

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

Jeremy Alan Lieberman

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Adam M. Apton

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

55 Broadway, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Gregory Bradley Linkh

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

230 Park Avenue, Suite 358

New York, NY 10169

David Avi Rosenfeld

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP (LI)

58 South Service Road, Suite 200

Melville, NY 11747

Phillip C. Kim

Attorney at The Rosen Law Firm

275 Madison Avenue, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Thomas W. Elrod

Attorney at Kirby McInerney LLP

250 Park Avenue, Suite 820

New York, NY 10177

Albert Yong Chang

Attorney at Johnson Bottini, LLP

501 W. Broadway, Suite 1720

San Diego, CA 92101

Charles H. Linehan

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Barbara A. Podell

Attorney at Berger & Montague, P.C.

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Ira M. Press

Attorney at Kirby McInerney LLP

250 Park Avenue, Suite 820

New York, NY 10177

Michael C. Dell'Angelo

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

83 #3

Exhibit C - Proposed Order

83 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit

83 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

83 #83

Main Document

#82

(#82) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joanna Andrea Diakos on behalf of Cogency Global Inc., Colleen A. Devries..(Diakos, Joanna) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#81

(#81) STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 1: NOW, THEREFORE, the Parties stipulate and agree, subject to the approval of the Court, as follows: 1. Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before May 31, 2022; 2. Defendants shall answer or move as to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint on or before July 15, 2022; 3. In response to any Defendants' dispositive motion ("First Dispositive Motions") as to Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Complaint, Plaintiff may file either a response or a Second Amended Complaint as follows : (a) Response to Dispositive Motion (i) If Plaintiff responds to Defendants' motion(s) due July 15, 2022, in lieu of filing a Second Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before August 15, 2022; (ii) Defendants shall file any replies to Plaintiff's response on or before September 14, 2022. (b) (ii) Defendants shall file any replies to Plaintiff's response on or before Second Amended Complaint (i) If Plaintiff files a Second Amended Complaint in response to Defendants' motion(s) as to the May 31, 2022, Consolidated Amended Complaint, the Second Amended Complaint, before August 15, 2022 and Defendants First Dispositive Motions will be denied without prejudice as moot; (ii) Defendants shall answer or move as to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint on or before September 14, 2022; (iii) Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' motion(s) on or before October 14, 2022; and (iv) Defendants shall file any replies to Plaintiff's response on or before November 14, 2022. 4. If, while a dispositive motion in this case is pending, the Supreme Court of the State of New York issues a decision on the pending motion to dismiss in Sonny St. John v. Cloopen Group Holding Limited, No. 65261712021 (Sup. Ct., N.Y. Cnty.), a case with overlapping Section 11 and 15 claims pending against Cloopen, Goldman Sachs (Asia) L.L.C., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited, Futu Inc., and Cogency Global Inc., the Parties agree to meet and confer regarding the necessity for supplemental briefing in this action and to submit a proposal to this Court for the submission of supplemental briefing, if any. IT IS SO STIPULATED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/19/2022) ( Motions due by 9/14/2022., Responses due by 10/14/2022, Replies due by 11/14/2022.) (ks) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#80

(#80) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Guozhang Wang..(Dell'Angelo, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#79

(#79) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Dean Cording on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Futu Inc., Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C., Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited..(Cording, Charles) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#78

(#78) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd G. Cosenza on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Futu Inc., Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C., Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited..(Cosenza, Todd) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Goldman Sachs (Asia) L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Colleen A. Devries, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cogency Global Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Changxun Sun, Yipeng Li, Kui Zhou, Qingsheng Zheng, Xiaodong Liang, Zi Yang, Ming Liao, Feng Zhu, Lok Yan Hui, Jianhong Zhou, Ching Chiu, Xiegang Xiong, Cheng Luo, And Yunhao Liu, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cloopen Group Holding Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#1

(#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FUTU Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

124 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #83 MOTION for Barbara A. Podell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26108688. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) MOTION for Barbara A. Podell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26108688. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Guozhang Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order).(Podell, Barbara) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joanna Andrea Diakos on behalf of Cogency Global Inc., Colleen A. Devries..(Diakos, Joanna) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 1: NOW, THEREFORE, the Parties stipulate and agree, subject to the approval of the Court, as follows: 1. Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before May 31, 2022; 2. Defendants shall answer or move as to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint on or before July 15, 2022; 3. In response to any Defendants' dispositive motion ("First Dispositive Motions") as to Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Complaint, Plaintiff may file either a response or a Second Amended Complaint as follows : (a) Response to Dispositive Motion (i) If Plaintiff responds to Defendants' motion(s) due July 15, 2022, in lieu of filing a Second Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before August 15, 2022; (ii) Defendants shall file any replies to Plaintiff's response on or before September 14, 2022. (b) (ii) Defendants shall file any replies to Plaintiff's response on or before Second Amended Complaint (i) If Plaintiff files a Second Amended Complaint in response to Defendants' motion(s) as to the May 31, 2022, Consolidated Amended Complaint, the Second Amended Complaint, before August 15, 2022 and Defendants First Dispositive Motions will be denied without prejudice as moot; (ii) Defendants shall answer or move as to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint on or before September 14, 2022; (iii) Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' motion(s) on or before October 14, 2022; and (iv) Defendants shall file any replies to Plaintiff's response on or before November 14, 2022. 4. If, while a dispositive motion in this case is pending, the Supreme Court of the State of New York issues a decision on the pending motion to dismiss in Sonny St. John v. Cloopen Group Holding Limited, No. 65261712021 (Sup. Ct., N.Y. Cnty.), a case with overlapping Section 11 and 15 claims pending against Cloopen, Goldman Sachs (Asia) L.L.C., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited, Futu Inc., and Cogency Global Inc., the Parties agree to meet and confer regarding the necessity for supplemental briefing in this action and to submit a proposal to this Court for the submission of supplemental briefing, if any. IT IS SO STIPULATED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/19/2022) ( Motions due by 9/14/2022., Responses due by 10/14/2022, Replies due by 11/14/2022.) (ks) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Guozhang Wang..(Dell'Angelo, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Dean Cording on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Futu Inc., Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C., Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited..(Cording, Charles) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd G. Cosenza on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Futu Inc., Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C., Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited..(Cosenza, Todd) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting #75 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/12/2022) Attorney David Avi Rosenfeld terminated (ks) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #76 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Ruoshui Sun. Related Document Number: #75 ..(Rosenfeld, David) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FUTU Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Goldman Sachs (Asia) L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Colleen A. Devries, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cogency Global Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Changxun Sun, Yipeng Li, Kui Zhou, Qingsheng Zheng, Xiaodong Liang, Zi Yang, Ming Liao, Feng Zhu, Lok Yan Hui, Jianhong Zhou, Ching Chiu, Xiegang Xiong, Cheng Luo, And Yunhao Liu, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cloopen Group Holding Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COGENCY GLOBAL INC., China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, Ching Chiu, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cloopen Group Holding Limited, Colleen A. Devries, FUTU INC., Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C., Lok Yan Hui, Yipeng Li, Xiaodong Liang, Ming Liao, Yunhao Liu, Cheng Luo, Changxun Sun, Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited, Xiegang Xiong, Zi Yang, Qingsheng Zheng, Jianhong Zhou, Kui Zhou, Feng Zhu. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25455176)Document filed by Boyan Dong..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COGENCY GLOBAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Citigroup Global Markets Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Goldman Sachs & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Albert Y. Chang