Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2020 at 09:37:45 (UTC).

Dones-Vargas v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Dones-Vargas filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04124

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orlando Dones-Vargas

Oxford, WI 53952

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Kevin Koliner

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

Stephanie C. Bengford

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638, 357.2341, Fax: 330.4402

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Attorney-Client Privilege WAIVER by Orlando Dones-Vargas. (KLE) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service by United States of America (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

8 #2

Unsigned Waivers

8 #1

Letter

#8

(#8) WAIVER by Orlando Dones-Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Unsigned Waivers)(SLT) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

7 #3

waiver-Ramstad

7 #2

waiver-Kirby

7 #1

waiver-Kolbeck

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 motion for waiver and affidavit from defense counsel and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 waiver-Kolbeck, #2 waiver-Kirby, #3 waiver-Ramstad) (CG) Mailed Order and attached waivers to Plaintiff via USPS on 9/22/2020 (DJP). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance filed by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Bengford on behalf of United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing service upon respondent. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/21/2020. (CG) Mailed to Plaintiff on 8/21/2020 (DJP). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: 17-cr-40086 filed by Orlando Dones-Vargas. (KLE) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Attorney-Client Privilege WAIVER by Orlando Dones-Vargas. (KLE) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service by United States of America (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER by Orlando Dones-Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Unsigned Waivers)(SLT) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 motion for waiver and affidavit from defense counsel and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 waiver-Kolbeck, #2 waiver-Kirby, #3 waiver-Ramstad) (CG) Mailed Order and attached waivers to Plaintiff via USPS on 9/22/2020 (DJP). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance filed by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Bengford on behalf of United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER directing service upon respondent. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/21/2020. (CG) Mailed to Plaintiff on 8/21/2020 (DJP). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (KLE) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: 17-cr-40086 filed by Orlando Dones-Vargas. (KLE) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie C. Bengford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Koliner