This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2022 at 08:56:36 (UTC).

Donegal Mutual Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTONE LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Donegal Mutual Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Broan-NuTONE LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00384

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donegal Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants

Broan-NuTone LLC

The Home Depot, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John L. Wainright

Attorney at Meyer Darragh Buckler Bebenek & Eck, PLLC

600 Grant Street, Suite 4850

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

Robert John Hafner

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla

1700 Market Street, Suite 1418

Philadelphia, PA 19103-3907

John Grant Stringham

Attorney at The Chartwell Law Offices LLP

130 North 18Th Street, 26Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Home Depot, Inc. from Bradford County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-111. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5880750), filed by The Home Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - County Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Home Depot Answer to County Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's reply to Answer to County Complaint)(nr) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A - County Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Home Depot Answer to County Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C - Plaintiff's reply to Answer to County Complaint

#2

(#2) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 3/23/2022. (jr) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Wainright, John) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

3 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A

3 #2

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses by Broan-NuTone LLC.(Hafner, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Broan-NuTone LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-NuTone LLC. (Hafner, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#6

(#6) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company.(Wainright, John) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#7

(#7) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Home Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo)(Stringham, John) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

7 #1

Proposed Order

7 #2

Memo

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Home Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo)(Stringham, John) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company.(Wainright, John) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Broan-NuTone LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-NuTone LLC. (Hafner, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses by Broan-NuTone LLC.(Hafner, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Wainright, John) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 3/23/2022. (jr) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketADMISSION FORMS AND ECF REGISTRATION INSTRUCTIONS mailed to Attorney John Wainright. (lg) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Home Depot, Inc. from Bradford County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-111. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5880750), filed by The Home Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - County Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Home Depot Answer to County Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's reply to Answer to County Complaint)(nr) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Donegal Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT J. HAFNER