This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2020 at 10:25:48 (UTC).

Done v. Peapod LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 Done filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Peapod LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04194

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gilberto Done

Defendants

Joshua Muller

Peapod LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Albert K. Kim

Attorney at William Schwitzer & Associates, P.C.

820 Second Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Christine M. Capitolo

Attorney at Torino & Bernstein, P.C.

200 Old Country Road, Ste 220

Mineola, NY 11501

Jerome C Chapman, IV

Attorney at Torino & Bernstein, P.C.

200 Old Country Road

Mineola, NY 11501

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Capitolo, Christine) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

9 #3

Exhibit C-Notice of Removal to State Court

9 #2

Exhibit B-3017 Demand Confirmation

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 32328/2019E..Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-3017 Demand Confirmation, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Removal to State Court).(Capitolo, Christine) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#8

(#8) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 32328/2019E..Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Capitolo, Christine) Modified on 6/4/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Ahold Delhaize N.V., Corporate Parent Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Corporate Parent Ahold Americas Holdings, Inc. for Peapod LLC. Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Chapman, Jerome) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Gilberto Done.(Kim, Albert) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert K. Kim on behalf of Gilberto Done..(Kim, Albert) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerome C Chapman, IV on behalf of Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Chapman, Jerome) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Capitolo, Christine) Modified on 6/4/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine M. Capitolo on behalf of Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Capitolo, Christine) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit C-Removal from State Court

1 #3

Exhibit B-3017 Demand

1 #2

Exhibit A- Summons & Complaint

1 #1

Petition for Removal

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 32328/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20070826).Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit A- Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-3017 Demand, #4 Exhibit C-Removal from State Court).(Capitolo, Christine) Modified on 6/3/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 06/02/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Capitolo, Christine) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Notice of Filing Of Petition for Removal. Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Capitolo, Christine) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Christine M. Capitolo to RE-FILE Document #8 Notice of Removal. Use the event type Notice (other) found under the event list Other Filings. (jgo) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Christine M. Capitolo to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 32328/2019E..Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-3017 Demand Confirmation, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Removal to State Court).(Capitolo, Christine) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 32328/2019E..Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Capitolo, Christine) Modified on 6/4/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christine M. Capitolo to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the Petition for Removal must be filed as the initial pleading and the "Notice of Filing of Petition for Removal' must be filed as a separate filing under the Notice event type. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 6/8/2020. (jgo) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Ahold Delhaize N.V., Corporate Parent Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Corporate Parent Ahold Americas Holdings, Inc. for Peapod LLC. Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Chapman, Jerome) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Gilberto Done.(Kim, Albert) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert K. Kim on behalf of Gilberto Done..(Kim, Albert) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerome C Chapman, IV on behalf of Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Chapman, Jerome) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Capitolo, Christine) Modified on 6/4/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine M. Capitolo on behalf of Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC..(Capitolo, Christine) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 32328/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20070826).Document filed by Joshua Muller, Peapod LLC. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit A- Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-3017 Demand, #4 Exhibit C-Removal from State Court).(Capitolo, Christine) Modified on 6/3/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less