This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2020 at 18:08:53 (UTC).

Donato v. Allergan Sales, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 Donato filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Allergan Sales, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Klindt and Brian J. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00679

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James R. Klindt

Presiding Judge

Brian J. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly M. Donato

Defendants

Allergan Sales, LLC

Ricardo E Mojica

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Shakib

Attorney at Terrell Hogan, PA

8Th Floor, 233 E Bay St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Meredith Ross

Attorney at Creed & Gowdy

865 May St

Jacksonville, FL 32204

Bryan Scott Gowdy

Attorney at Creed & Gowdy, P.A.

865 May St

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Marie Harris

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

100 N. Tampa St., Ste. 2900

Tampa, FL 33602

Jennifer M. Voss

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602-5810

Brian T. Guthrie

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602-5810

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kimberly M. Donato. (Gowdy, Bryan) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply to Response to Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Gowdy, Bryan) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Voss, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING #5 Defendant Allegan Sales, LLC's Motion to Stay to the extent that the recently removed Allergan Cases are STAYED until the Court resolves the Allergan Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #10. The Clerk shall file this Order in all recently removed Allergan Cases and terminate any pending motions to stay. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/12/2020. (AMP) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

10 #3

Exhibit Ex. C

10 #2

Exhibit Ex. B

10 #1

Exhibit Ex. A

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kimberly M. Donato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C)(Gowdy, Bryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Ross on behalf of Kimberly M. Donato (Ross, Meredith) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Scott Gowdy on behalf of Kimberly M. Donato (Gowdy, Bryan) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in opposition re #5 Motion to Stay filed by Kimberly M. Donato. (Shakib, Christopher) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #5 Defendant Allergan Sales, LLC's Motion to Stay. Plaintiffs must timely file their response to the Motion to Stay or the Court will treat the Motion as unopposed. The parties shall file in this case any briefing connected to remand, including the stay sought until the issue is resolved. The Clerk shall file a copy of this Order in all recently removed Allergan cases. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/8/2020. (AMP) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#5

(#5) MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Voss, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Allergan Sales, LLC identifying corporate parent Affiliate Allergan, Inc. for Allergan Sales, LLC. (Harris, Rebecca) (Modified on 7/10/2020 to edit text)(SJW). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Allergan Sales, LLC, Ricardo E Mojica with Jury Demand filed by Kimberly M. Donato.(KEM) (Originally filed in State Court on March 25, 2020.) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kimberly M. Donato. (Gowdy, Bryan) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENDORSED ORDER: #13 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Reply is GRANTED. On or before August 27, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file their reply of not more than ten (10) substantive pages. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/19/2020. (AMP) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply to Response to Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Gowdy, Bryan) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Voss, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCase Stayed. (AEJ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #5 Defendant Allegan Sales, LLC's Motion to Stay to the extent that the recently removed Allergan Cases are STAYED until the Court resolves the Allergan Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #10. The Clerk shall file this Order in all recently removed Allergan Cases and terminate any pending motions to stay. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/12/2020. (AMP) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kimberly M. Donato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C)(Gowdy, Bryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Ross on behalf of Kimberly M. Donato (Ross, Meredith) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Scott Gowdy on behalf of Kimberly M. Donato (Gowdy, Bryan) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in opposition re #5 Motion to Stay filed by Kimberly M. Donato. (Shakib, Christopher) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #5 Defendant Allergan Sales, LLC's Motion to Stay. Plaintiffs must timely file their response to the Motion to Stay or the Court will treat the Motion as unopposed. The parties shall file in this case any briefing connected to remand, including the stay sought until the issue is resolved. The Clerk shall file a copy of this Order in all recently removed Allergan cases. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/8/2020. (AMP) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Voss, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Allergan Sales, LLC identifying corporate parent Affiliate Allergan, Inc. for Allergan Sales, LLC. (Harris, Rebecca) (Modified on 7/10/2020 to edit text)(SJW). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Allergan Sales, LLC, Ricardo E Mojica with Jury Demand filed by Kimberly M. Donato.(KEM) (Originally filed in State Court on March 25, 2020.) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:20-cv-679-J-39JRK. (SJB) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, Duval County, Florida, case number 16-2020-CA-001858-XXXX-MA filed in State Court on 3/25/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17000350 filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harris, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allergan Sales, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Marie Harris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN TERRY GUTHRIE