This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2022 at 08:12:59 (UTC).

Donald v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 Donald filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Midland Credit Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan B. Gottschall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06804

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan B. Gottschall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kamille Donald

Defendants

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Kohn Law Firm, S.C.

Search Investigations, Inc.

David E. Hyman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mario Kris Kasalo

Attorney at The Law Office of M. Kris Kasalo, Ltd.

4950 Madison St., P.O. Box 1425

Skokie, IL 60077

Defendant Attorneys

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer W. Weller

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kamille Donald; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kamille Donald by Mario Kris Kasalo (Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before March 2, 2022. In conformity with General Order 21-0027 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing and for requirements for status reports and discovery plans during the COVID-19 pandemic. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all defendants have been served. If all defendants have not been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 12/29/2021. Mailed notice(mjc, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kamille Donald as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022. (Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kohn Law Firm, S.C., Midland Credit Management, Inc. by Jennifer W. Weller (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kohn Law Firm, S.C., Midland Credit Management, Inc. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Counsel for defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., and Kohn Law Firm, S.C., are advised that no further action may be taken until all notifications as to affiliates required by Local Rule 3.2 have been filed. All notifications as to affiliates required by Local Rule 3.2 must be filed on or before February 11, 2022. Mailed notice (mjc, ) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Kohn Law Firm, S.C. (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendants Kohn Law Firm, S.C., Midland Credit Management, Inc. for extension of time to file answer UNOPPOSED (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendants' unopposed motion (No. #10 ) for an extension to and including 3/9/2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is granted. The deadline (No. #3 ) to file a joint initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan, is extended to and including 3/23/2022. Mailed notice (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kamille Donald as to Kohn Law Firm, S.C. on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022. (Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kamille Donald as to Search Investigations, Inc. on 2/11/2022, answer due 3/4/2022. (Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kamille Donald as to Search Investigations, Inc. on 2/11/2022, answer due 3/4/2022. (Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kamille Donald as to Kohn Law Firm, S.C. on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022. (Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendants' unopposed motion (No. #10 ) for an extension to and including 3/9/2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is granted. The deadline (No. #3 ) to file a joint initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan, is extended to and including 3/23/2022. Mailed notice (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Defendants Kohn Law Firm, S.C., Midland Credit Management, Inc. for extension of time to file answer UNOPPOSED (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Kohn Law Firm, S.C. (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Counsel for defendants Midland Credit Management, Inc., and Kohn Law Firm, S.C., are advised that no further action may be taken until all notifications as to affiliates required by Local Rule 3.2 have been filed. All notifications as to affiliates required by Local Rule 3.2 must be filed on or before February 11, 2022. Mailed notice (mjc, ) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kohn Law Firm, S.C., Midland Credit Management, Inc. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kohn Law Firm, S.C., Midland Credit Management, Inc. by Jennifer W. Weller (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kamille Donald as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022. (Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kohn Law Firm, S.C., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Search Investigations, Inc. (sxh, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before March 2, 2022. In conformity with General Order 21-0027 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing and for requirements for status reports and discovery plans during the COVID-19 pandemic. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all defendants have been served. If all defendants have not been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 12/29/2021. Mailed notice(mjc, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cm, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kamille Donald by Mario Kris Kasalo (Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kamille Donald; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kasalo, Mario) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kohn Law Firm, S.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Weller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Schultz