This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/16/2021 at 10:42:22 (UTC).

Donahue et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Donahue filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rex Donahue

Barbara Donahue

Defendants

Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

The First State Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven T. Cook

Attorney at COOK LAW OFFICES

P. O. Box 549

Barboursville, WV 25504

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher D. Smith

Attorney at BAILEY & GLASSER

209 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301-1386

Benjamin L. Bailey

Attorney at BAILEY & GLASSER

209 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301-1386

 

Court Documents

#8

7 #4

Exhibit 4

7 #3

Exhibit 3

7 #2

Exhibit 2

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

6 #3

Summons for Nicholas Katsonis

6 #2

Summons for B. Amon

6 #1

Summons for Robert Feldman

#6

5 #2

Summons for Attorney General of the United States, US Department of Justice

5 #1

Summons for Robert Feldman

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Proposed Summons as to B. Amon and Nicholas Katsonis

1 #3

Proposed Summons as to Robert Feldman

1 #2

Proposed Summons as to Attorney General

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for The First State Bank in support of #7 MOTION by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for The First State Bank for Dismissal of All Claims With Prejudice, re: 1 Complaint. (Smith, Christopher) (Modified on 3/5/2021 to add party filer) (mkw).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for The First State Bank for Dismissal of All Claims With Prejudice, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Smith, Christopher) (Modified on 3/5/2021 to add party filer) (mkw).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as receiver for The First State Bank, re: #1 Complaint,. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons for Robert Feldman, #2 Summons for B. Amon, #3 Summons for Nicholas Katsonis) (hkl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Rex Donahue for Rex Donahue, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Robert Feldman, #2 Summons for Attorney General of the United States, US Department of Justice, #3 Summons for Attorney General of the United States, US Department of Justice. (Cook, Steven)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE by Rex Donahue in support of #1 Complaint. (Cook, Steven)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 summons as to Robert Feldman, #2 Summons as to B. Amon and Nicholas Katsonis) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7854933. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Summons as to Attorney General, #3 Proposed Summons as to Robert Feldman, #4 Proposed Summons as to B. Amon and Nicholas Katsonis, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First State Bank of Brownsboro is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven T. Cook