This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/27/2021 at 08:45:59 (UTC).

Domokos v. Reserves Network, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Domokos filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Reserves Network, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia A. Gaughan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00449

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patricia A. Gaughan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julie Domokos

Defendants

Reserves Network, Inc.

Neil Stallard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew D. Besser

Attorney at Bolek Besser Glesius

302 Monarch Centre, 5885 Landerbrook Drive

Cleveland, OH 44124

Cathleen M. Bolek

Attorney at Bolek Besser Glesius

5885 Landerbrook Drive

Cleveland, OH 44124

Defendant Attorneys

Karina R. Conley

Attorney at McDonald Hopkins - Cleveland

600 Superior Avenue, E

Cleveland, OH 44114

Dan L. Makee

Attorney at McDonald Hopkins - Cleveland

600 Superior Avenue, E

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case Management Order: Case Management Conference was held on 4/23/21. Case is assigned to the standard track. Case is not suitable for Mediation/Settlement Conference at this time. Non-expert discovery shall be completed on or before 10/29/21. Expert reports shall be exchanged on or before 1/14/22 for party with burden of proof & 2/18/22 for Rebuttal and Expert Discovery shall be completed on or before 3/18/22. Pleadings shall be amended without leave of Court and new parties shall be joined on or before 7/22/21. Dispositive Motions shall be filed on or before 11/30/21. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/7/21 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will initiate the call with attorneys only. However, the parties must be available for immediate contact. Counsel shall confer within three business days of any scheduled conference to discuss outstanding issues and respective positions as to settlement. Counsel shall provide to the Court three business days prior to the conference a joint Status Report or confidential individual Status Reports describing the status of discovery, settlement positions, and issues to be addressed. The Status Report(s) need not be filed, but may be delivered via e-mail at Gaughan_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/23/21. (LC,S) Time: 30 mins. (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bolek, Cathleen) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Attorney Appearance Dan Makee, Karina Conley, McDonald Hopkins LLC by Dan L. Makee filed by on behalf of Reserves Network, Inc., Neil Stallard. (Makee, Dan) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Julie Domokos. All Defendants filed on behalf of Julie Domokos (Bolek, Cathleen) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 4/23/2021 at 09:15 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/05/21. (D,Ma) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISREGARD-ENTERED IN ERROR Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 3/23/2021 at 09:15 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/05/21. (D,Ma) Modified on 3/5/2021 (LC,S). (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketJudge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Neil Stallard, Reserves Network, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10679541. Filed by Julie Domokos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Right to Sue) (Bolek, Cathleen) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESERVES NETWORK INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cathleen M. Bolek