This case was last updated from PACER on 04/25/2020 at 08:59:19 (UTC).

Domino Foods, Inc. v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 Domino Foods, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against CSX Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-80285

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Domino Foods, Inc.

Defendants

Norfolk Southern Railway Co.

Union Pacific Railroad Company

BNSF Railway Co.

CSX Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stuart Harold Singer

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner

401 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

James Michael Grippando

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP

401 East Las Olas Blvd., Suite 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Carlos Mario Sires

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner

401 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) transferring case to the District of Columbia re: MDL 2925 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Beryl A. Howell. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Regarding Defendants' Obligation to File an Answer or Other Response, Order Requiring Scheduling Report, and Deadlines Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) and (f) by Domino Foods, Inc.. Responses due by 4/1/2020 (Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc.. Norfolk Southern Railway Co. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc.. Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc.. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES, Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

3 #3

Summon(s)

3 #2

Summon(s)

3 #1

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Co., CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Co., Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(jbs) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

1 #5

Summon(s) (Union Pacific Railroad Company)

1 #4

Summon(s) (BNSF Railway Company)

1 #3

Summon(s) (Norfolk Southern Railway Company)

1 #2

Summon(s) (CSX Transportation, Inc.)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12509308, filed by Domino Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) (CSX Transportation, Inc.), #3 Summon(s) (Norfolk Southern Railway Company), #4 Summon(s) (BNSF Railway Company), #5 Summon(s) (Union Pacific Railroad Company))(Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • Docket(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in District of Columbia as case 1:20-cv-00776, filed 03/19/2020. (jua) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketSYSTEM ENTRY - Case 9:20-cv-80285 electronically transferred out to District of Columbia. (mc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per DE #14 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) transferring case to the District of Columbia re: MDL 2925 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Beryl A. Howell. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. This case and the obligations imposed by the Court's Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) and (f) shall be stayed for thirty days. On or before April 17, 2020, Plaintiff shall inform the Court of the status of the transfer of this action to Multidistrict Litigation No. 2925 as ordered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: Rail Freight Fuel Surcharge Antitrust Litigation (No. II), Misc. No. 20-00008 (BAH), Dkt. No. 149. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/18/2020. (AHS) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Regarding Defendants' Obligation to File an Answer or Other Response, Order Requiring Scheduling Report, and Deadlines Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) and (f) by Domino Foods, Inc.. Responses due by 4/1/2020 (Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see DE#10. It is not necessary to refile this document. (scn) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. See DE#6 for image. (scn) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc.. Norfolk Southern Railway Co. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc.. Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc.. BNSF Railway Co. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Domino Foods, Inc.. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES, Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE.Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/2/2020. (eca) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Co., CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Co., Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(jbs) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12509308, filed by Domino Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) (CSX Transportation, Inc.), #3 Summon(s) (Norfolk Southern Railway Company), #4 Summon(s) (BNSF Railway Company), #5 Summon(s) (Union Pacific Railroad Company))(Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less