This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 08:37:10 (UTC).

Dominguez v. Cascade Capital, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Dominguez filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Cascade Capital, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul C. Huck and Jacqueline Becerra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-24380

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul C. Huck

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Becerra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramset Dominguez

Defendant

Cascade Capital, LLC

1670 Corporate Cir., Suite 202

Petaluma, CA 94954

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel David Lucoff

Suite 415, 3440 Hollywood Blvd, Suite 415

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorney

Charles James McHale, Jr.

Attorney at Golden Scaz Gagain, PLLC

201 North Armenia Avenue

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Ramset Dominguez (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING CIVIL JURY TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck., Calendar Call set for 7/14/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cascade Capital, LLC. (McHale, Charles) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Cascade Capital, LLC re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, of No Opposition to its Motion (McHale, Charles) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Cascade Capital, LLC. Attorney Charles James McHale, Jr added to party Cascade Capital, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McHale, Charles) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ramset Dominguez. Cascade Capital, LLC served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Cascade Capital, LLC. (kpe) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Summon(s)

1 #4

Exhibit Ex D M4 Clerk's Default

1 #3

Exhibit Ex C Ord Grant M2D

1 #2

Exhibit Ex B NOH

1 #1

Exhibit Ex A M2D

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cascade Capital, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13750333, filed by Ramset Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A M2D, #2 Exhibit Ex B NOH, #3 Exhibit Ex C Ord Grant M2D, #4 Exhibit Ex D M4 Clerk's Default, #5 Summon(s), #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Ramset Dominguez (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING CIVIL JURY TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck., Calendar Call set for 7/14/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cascade Capital, LLC. (McHale, Charles) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/17/2020. (amu) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Cascade Capital, LLC re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, of No Opposition to its Motion (McHale, Charles) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Cascade Capital, LLC. Attorney Charles James McHale, Jr added to party Cascade Capital, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McHale, Charles) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ramset Dominguez. Cascade Capital, LLC served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Cascade Capital, LLC. (kpe) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cascade Capital, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13750333, filed by Ramset Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A M2D, #2 Exhibit Ex B NOH, #3 Exhibit Ex C Ord Grant M2D, #4 Exhibit Ex D M4 Clerk's Default, #5 Summon(s), #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less