This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:40:06 (UTC).

Dominguez v. Accounts Receivable Resources, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Dominguez filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Accounts Receivable Resources, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia G. Cooke and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-20043

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eliezer Tapanes Dominguez

Defendants

Olympia, LLP

Accounts Receivable Resources, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Aaron Herman

Attorney at Consumer Advocates Law Group, PLLC

11A-560, 4801 Linton Blvd

Delray Beach, FL 33445

Joel Adrian Brown

Attorney at The Fair Credit Law Group, LLC

2541 Sw 27 Ave, Suite 300

Miami, FL 33133

Thomas John Patti, III

Attorney at Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 S.E. 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Jibrael Jarallah Said Hindi

Attorney at The Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 Se 6Th St., 17Th Floor

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley Jason Kaplan

Attorney at Kaplan & Freedman, P.A.

9410 Sw 77Th Ave.

Miami, FL 33156

Charles James McHale, Jr.

Attorney at Golden Scaz Gagain, PLLC

201 North Armenia Avenue

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Olympia, LLP. Attorney Bradley Jason Kaplan added to party Olympia, LLP(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Ext Time)(Kaplan, Bradley) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Accounts Receivable Resources, Inc.. Attorney Charles James McHale, Jr added to party Accounts Receivable Resources, Inc.(pty:dft). (McHale, Charles) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Compliance by Eliezer Tapanes Dominguez re #5 Statement filed by Eliezer Tapanes Dominguez (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#14

(#14) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Olympia, LLP (Kaplan, Bradley) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Statement of: Claim by Eliezer Tapanes Dominguez re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Ext Time

#13

(#13) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Olympia, LLP. (Kaplan, Bradley) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

1 #3

Summon(s)

#10

(#10) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Eliezer Tapanes Dominguez (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#9

(#9) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Accounts Receivable Resources, Inc. (McHale, Charles) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

3 #1

Summon(s)

1 #4

Summon(s)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Accounts Receivable Resources, Inc. (McHale, Charles) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12277856, filed by Eliezer Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 03/09/2020. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (kou) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Olympia, LLP (Kaplan, Bradley) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Olympia, LLP. (Kaplan, Bradley) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant OLYMPIA, LLP shall file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial on or before February 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/5/2020. (kou) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Olympia, LLP. Attorney Bradley Jason Kaplan added to party Olympia, LLP(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Ext Time)(Kaplan, Bradley) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Eliezer Tapanes Dominguez (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Accounts Receivable Resources, Inc. (McHale, Charles) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Accounts Receivable Resources, Inc. (McHale, Charles) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Accounts Receivable Resources, Inc.. Attorney Charles James McHale, Jr added to party Accounts Receivable Resources, Inc.(pty:dft). (McHale, Charles) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Compliance by Eliezer Tapanes Dominguez re #5 Statement filed by Eliezer Tapanes Dominguez (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of: Claim by Eliezer Tapanes Dominguez re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 03/09/2020. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (kou) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Accounts Receivable Resources, Inc., Olympia, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12277856, filed by Eliezer Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.