Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/02/2021 at 07:59:07 (UTC).

Dolney v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Dolney filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Aetna Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liles C Burke and C Lynwood Smith, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00620

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Liles C Burke

C Lynwood Smith, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherell Anne Dolney

Defendants

Aetna Life Insurance Company

Harford Life and Accident Insurance Company

The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth D Hampton

Attorney at KENNETH D. HAMPTON, ATTORNEY

2004 Poole Drive, Suite A

Huntsville, AL 35810

Defendant Attorney

William B Wahlheim, Jr

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

1901 6Th Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203-2618

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 6/10/2021. (AHI) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#8

(#8) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Harford Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc.(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER - The Court GRANTS the #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Aetna Life Insurance Company answer due 6/9/2021; Harford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer due 6/9/2021; The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc answer due 6/9/2021. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 5/10/2021. (AHI) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - This action is REASSIGNED to Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr. Judge Liles C Burke no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:21-cv-620-CLS on all subsequent pleadings. (AHI ) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Harford Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc. (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc. filed by The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harford Life and Accident Insurance Company. filed by Harford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Aetna Life Insurance Company (AHI) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by defendants from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-cv-2021-900402, filed by defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(AHI) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 6/10/2021. (AHI) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Harford Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc.(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER - The Court GRANTS the #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Aetna Life Insurance Company answer due 6/9/2021; Harford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer due 6/9/2021; The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc answer due 6/9/2021. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 5/10/2021. (AHI) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - This action is REASSIGNED to Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr. Judge Liles C Burke no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:21-cv-620-CLS on all subsequent pleadings. (AHI ) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Harford Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc. (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc. filed by The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harford Life and Accident Insurance Company. filed by Harford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Aetna Life Insurance Company (AHI) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by defendants from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-cv-2021-900402, filed by defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(AHI) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth D Hampton