This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2022 at 10:33:00 (UTC).

Dollar v. Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 Dollar filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Buchanan Hauling Rigging, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sean D. Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00732

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sean D. Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Dollar

Defendant

Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan Alan Green

Chad Christopher Taylor

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Paul Sharp

Brett David Timmons

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings

#2

(#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc. Certificate of Interested Persons (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Paul Sharp on behalf of Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc. (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc. of Associated Attorneys (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#6

(#6) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc., filed by Scott Dollar.(rpc, ) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#7

(#7) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc..(rpc, ) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER AND ADVISORY. The Court ORDERS the parties to replead as necessary to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Rules. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 8/29/2022. (slo, ) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#9

(#9) ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION for Leave to File Designation of Responsible Third Parties by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc.. (Timmons, Brett) Modified on 8/31/2022 (rpc, ). (Entered: 08/31/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant may designate Randy Mundt and Freerksen Trucking, Inc., as responsible third parties in this case. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/2/2022. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/1/2022. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 11/30/2022 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/28/2022. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#13

(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc., filed by Scott Dollar.(Green, Bryan) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendants' First Amended Original ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc..(Timmons, Brett) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc., filed by Scott Dollar.(Green, Bryan) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/1/2022. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 11/30/2022 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/28/2022. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant may designate Randy Mundt and Freerksen Trucking, Inc., as responsible third parties in this case. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/2/2022. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to File to Designate Responsible Third Parties by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Timmons, Brett) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #9 MOTION for Leave to File Designation of Responsible Third Parties submitted by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc.. The Motion is missing a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION for Leave to File Designation of Responsible Third Parties by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc.. (Timmons, Brett) Modified on 8/31/2022 (rpc, ). (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER AND ADVISORY. The Court ORDERS the parties to replead as necessary to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Rules. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 8/29/2022. (slo, ) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc..(rpc, ) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc., filed by Scott Dollar.(rpc, ) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc. of Associated Attorneys (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Paul Sharp on behalf of Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc. (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc. Certificate of Interested Persons (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc. from Denton County DC, case number 22-5875-442. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9090491), filed by Buchanan Hauling & Rigging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings)(Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less