This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2021 at 06:06:31 (UTC).

DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC. v. PROVIDENCE PROPERTIES, LLC

Case Summary

On November 23, 2021, Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (“Tenant” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Craig R. Tractenberg of Fox Rothschild LLP, filed a property lawsuit against Providence Properties, LLC (“Landlord” or “Defendant”) seeking damages along with costs for the alleged breach of contract by Defendant. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania with Judge Juan R. Sanchez presiding.

 

In the complaint Plaintiff alleged that, “The parties entered into a Lease Agreement dated September 1, 2010 (the “Lease”) pursuant to which Tenant leases from Landlord through January 31, 2026 the property located at 701 Hanover Avenue, Allentown, PA (the “Premises”) in which Tenant operates a variety store. Pursuant to section A.11(a) of the Lease, Tenant was to “pay actual Real Estate Taxes in accordance with Section F.2 of this Lease.” Despite reasonable requests, Landlord has not complied with section F.2. Rather, Landlord deceptively invoiced Tenant on a pro-rated monthly basis for the real estate taxes it claimed were due knowing that the actual tax bill in reality would be, or actually were, for less money.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that, “For calendar years 2010 to present, Landlord collected from Tenant over $100,000 more in putative “tax” payments than Tenant owed (the “Excess Payments). By letter dated February 6, 2019, Tenant demanded that Landlord (a) provide copies of documents identifying the actual Real Estate Taxes for the years 2010 through 2018, inclusive; and (b) refund for each of those years the difference between the amount of alleged “taxes” Landlord collected from Tenant and the actual Real Estate Taxes for that year. Landlord failed to comply with Tenant’s demand and repudiated Landlord’s obligation to provide and bill for taxes only upon presentation of the actual tax bill. By letter dated October 20, 2021, Tenant issued a 30 day notice to cure to Landlord describing the breaches and requested refund of the Excess Payments, but Landlord has ignored the notice to cure.”

 

Plaintiff also alleged that, “Landlord breached its obligations under the Lease by failing to provide actual real estate tax bills to Tenant and by billing in a method not authorized under the Lease. The Lease, like all contracts in Pennsylvania, contains an implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing that obligated Landlord to deal with Tenant fairly and in good faith. Tenant has suffered damages as a result of Landlord’s breach.”

 

There are three claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff. The first claim deals with the alleged breach of contract – recovery of excess payments. The second claim deals with the alleged breach of contract – failure to act in good faith. The third claim deals with the alleged unjust enrichment and recoupment.

 

In its prayer for relief Plaintiff has requested the court for a judgment against Landlord for compensatory damages, together with costs, interest, and attorneys’ fees, as well as such other relief as the court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05162

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC.

Defendant

PROVIDENCE PROPERTIES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAIG R. TRACTENBERG

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

2000 Market St 20Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103-3222

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Disclosure Statement

#2

(#2) EXHIBIT Designation Form by DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC... (TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Dollar Tree, Inc. by DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC..(TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Dollar Tree, Inc. by DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC..(TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT Designation Form by DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC... (TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAttorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Providence Properties LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15568082.), filed by DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement)(TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAIG R. TRACTENBERG