This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2019 at 07:07:49 (UTC).

Dolin v. Baer et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 Dolin filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Baer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01310

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Natalia Dolin

Defendants

Jessica A. Baer

Craig Niederberger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David G. Sigale

Attorney at Law Firm of David G. Sigale, P.C.

799 Roosevelt Road, Suite 207

Glen Ellyn, IL 60137

Gregory Dolin

Attorney at University Of Baltimore

1420 N. Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201

Alan Gura

Attorney at Gura PLLC

916 Prince Street, Suite 107

Alexandria, VA 22314

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas A. Ioppolo

Attorney at Illinois Attorney General's Office (100 West Randolph)

100 West Randolph Street, 13Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Michael Charles Stephenson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

100 W. Randolph St., 13 Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry #14 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly contained an error and is corrected as follows: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 4/16/2019 with attorneys for both sides. Response to complaint is to be filed by 5/14/2019. Response to motion for preliminary injunction #8 is due by 5/14/2019; reply to response is due by 6/4/2019. Neither party believes that discovery or an evidentiary hearing will be required on the motion. Status hearing set for 5/16/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 4/16/2019 with attorneys for both sides. Response to complaint is to be filed by 5/14/2019. Response to motion for preliminary injunction #8 is due by 5/14/2019; reply to response is due by 6/4/2019. Neither party believes that discovery or an evidentiary hearing will be required on the motion. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jessica A. Baer, Craig Niederberger by Thomas A. Ioppolo (Ioppolo, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jessica A. Baer, Craig Niederberger by Michael Charles Stephenson (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#11

(#11) DECLARATION of Natalia Dolin regarding memorandum in support of motion #9 , motion for preliminary injunction #8 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #8 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM by Natalia Dolin in support of motion for preliminary injunction #8 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION by Plaintiff Natalia Dolin for preliminary injunction (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 4/16/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Alan Gura to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. (mk) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #4 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/5/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15523703. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Natalia Dolin by David G. Sigale (Sigale, David) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Natalia Dolin by Gregory Dolin (Dolin, Gregory) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Natalia Dolin; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15513072. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE entry #14 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly contained an error and is corrected as follows: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 4/16/2019 with attorneys for both sides. Response to complaint is to be filed by 5/14/2019. Response to motion for preliminary injunction #8 is due by 5/14/2019; reply to response is due by 6/4/2019. Neither party believes that discovery or an evidentiary hearing will be required on the motion. Status hearing set for 5/16/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 4/16/2019 with attorneys for both sides. Response to complaint is to be filed by 5/14/2019. Response to motion for preliminary injunction #8 is due by 5/14/2019; reply to response is due by 6/4/2019. Neither party believes that discovery or an evidentiary hearing will be required on the motion. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jessica A. Baer, Craig Niederberger by Thomas A. Ioppolo (Ioppolo, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jessica A. Baer, Craig Niederberger by Michael Charles Stephenson (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DECLARATION of Natalia Dolin regarding memorandum in support of motion #9 , motion for preliminary injunction #8 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #8 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM by Natalia Dolin in support of motion for preliminary injunction #8 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION by Plaintiff Natalia Dolin for preliminary injunction (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 4/16/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jessica A. Baer (daj, ) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Craig Niederberger. (acm) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Alan Gura to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. (mk) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #4 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/5/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15523703. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Natalia Dolin by David G. Sigale (Sigale, David) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Natalia Dolin by Gregory Dolin (Dolin, Gregory) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Natalia Dolin; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15513072. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David G. Sigale

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Gura