This case was last updated from PACER on 05/09/2020 at 08:27:11 (UTC).

Dold et al v. Snohomish County et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 Dold filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Snohomish County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00383

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jennifer Dold

Kathy Duncan

Defendants

Snohomish County

Cody McCoy

Bryson Mcgee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James E Lobsenz

Attorney at CARNEY BADLEY SPELLMAN PS

701 Fifth Ave, Ste 3600

Seattle, WA 98104-7010

Defendant Attorneys

Margaret Duncan

Attorney at SNOHOMISH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY (CIVIL)

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201-4046

Geoffrey A Enns

Attorney at SNOHOMISH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY (CIVIL)

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201-4046

Katherine H Bosch

Attorney at SNOHOMISH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY (CIVIL)

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201-4046

Shannon M Ragonesi

Attorney at KEATING BUCKLIN MCCORMACK INC PS

801 Second Avenue, Suite 1210

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/15/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/22/2020, Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shannon M Ragonesi on behalf of Defendant Cody McCoy. (Ragonesi, Shannon) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Bryson McGee, Snohomish County.(Enns, Geoffrey) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Geoffrey A Enns on behalf of Defendant Bryson McGee. (Enns, Geoffrey) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Geoffrey A Enns on behalf of Defendant Snohomish County. (Enns, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(CDA) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Jennifer Dold, Kathy Duncan with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6201820), filed by Jennifer Dold, Kathy Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lobsenz, James) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/15/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/22/2020, Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shannon M Ragonesi on behalf of Defendant Cody McCoy. (Ragonesi, Shannon) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Bryson McGee, Snohomish County.(Enns, Geoffrey) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Geoffrey A Enns on behalf of Defendant Bryson McGee. (Enns, Geoffrey) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorneys Katherine H Bosch, Margaret Duncan added for Snohomish County; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (MW) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Geoffrey A Enns on behalf of Defendant Snohomish County. (Enns, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(CDA) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (CDA) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Jennifer Dold, Kathy Duncan with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6201820), filed by Jennifer Dold, Kathy Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lobsenz, James) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SNOHOMISH COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margaret Duncan(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Heather Bosch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey A Enns