This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:30:31 (UTC).

Dolan v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Dolan filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew T. Baxter and Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00949

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrew T. Baxter

Presiding Judge

Frederick J. Scullin, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stacey L. Dolan

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard D. Olinsky

Attorney at Olinsky Law Group

250 South Clinton Street, Ste 210

Syracuse, NY 13202

Defendant Attorney

Nicole Sonia

Attorney at Social Security Administration

J.F.K. Federal Building, Room 625, 15 New Sudbury Street

Boston, MA 02203

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr and US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter for all further proceedings. Parties have not consented. Authorized by the Chief Judge pursuant to General Order #18. (plp) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Stacey L. Dolan advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Olinsky, Howard) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicole Sonia appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 11/25/2020. (Sonia, Nicole) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER: granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that the Social Security Consent/Declination Form is due by 9/9/2020. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/21/2020. (nmk) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 9/9/2020. (mgh) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stacey L. Dolan. (mgh) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (mgh) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less