This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2021 at 10:57:48 (UTC).

Dolan et al v. Cimarex Energy Co.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 Dolan filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Cimarex Energy Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carmen E. Garza and Gregory J. Fouratt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01304

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carmen E. Garza

Presiding Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeffery Lee Jones

Robert Dolan

Defendant

Cimarex Energy Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Josh Borsellino

Attorney at Borsellino, PC

1020 Macon St., Suite 15

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorneys

Michael F. Lauderdale

Attorney at McAfee & Taft, P.C.

10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 211 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Tony Puckett

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

10Th Floor-Two Leadership Square, 211 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Philip Bruce

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

10Th Floor- Two Leadership Square, 211 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Stanley K. Kotovsky, Jr.

Attorney at Tinnin Law Firm, a professional corporation

P. O. Box 25207.

Albuquerque, NM 87125

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Cimarex Energy Co. Answer due 2/16/2021. (ke) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cimarex Energy Co.. (Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Cimarex Energy Co. of Appearance and Certification for Tony G. Puckett (Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Cimarex Energy Co. of Appearance And Certification for Michael M. Lauderdale (Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Cimarex Energy Co. of Appearance and Certification for Philip R. Bruce (Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley K. Kotovsky, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cimarex Energy Co. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Robert Dolan, Jeffery Lee Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Borsellino, Josh) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Cimarex Energy Co. Answer due 2/16/2021. (ke) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cimarex Energy Co.. (Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAssociation Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7498226 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Cimarex Energy Co. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAssociation Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7498214 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Cimarex Energy Co. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAssociation Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7498197 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Cimarex Energy Co., 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Cimarex Energy Co., 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Cimarex Energy Co. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket(#9) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Cimarex Energy Co. by Stanley K. Kotovsky, Jr on behalf of: Philip R. Bruce McAfee & Taft, A Professional Corporation 10th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 211 North RobinsonOklahoma City, Oklahoma 73102 4052359621 Fax 405 228-7390 philip.bruce@mcafeetaft.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kotovsky, Stanley)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket(#8) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Cimarex Energy Co. by Stanley K. Kotovsky, Jr on behalf of: Tony G. Puckett McAfee & Taft, A Professional Corporation 8th Floor, Two Leadership,211 North Robinson Square,Oklahoma City, OK 73102 4052359621 Fax (405) 235-0439 tony.puckett@mcafeetaft.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kotovsky, Stanley)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket(#7) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Cimarex Energy Co. by Stanley K. Kotovsky, Jr on behalf of: Michael F. Lauderdale McAfee & Taft, A Professional Corporation 8th Floor, Two Leadership,211 North Robinson Square,Oklahoma City, OK 73102 (405) 235-9621 Fax (405) 235-0439 mike.lauderdale@mcafeetaft.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kotovsky, Stanley)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Cimarex Energy Co. of Appearance and Certification for Tony G. Puckett (Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Cimarex Energy Co. of Appearance And Certification for Michael M. Lauderdale (Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Cimarex Energy Co. of Appearance and Certification for Philip R. Bruce (Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley K. Kotovsky, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Kotovsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Cimarex Energy Co.. (jg) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketOffice code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7457213 re #1 Complaint filed by Jeffery Lee Jones, Robert Dolan (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Borsellino, Josh) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cimarex Energy Co. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Robert Dolan, Jeffery Lee Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Borsellino, Josh) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cimarex Energy Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Josh Borsellino