This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2019 at 07:39:17 (UTC).

Doig v. Standard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 Doig filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Standard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00365

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Doig

Defendant

Standard Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc S. Whitehead

Attorney at Marc Whitehead & Associates, LLP

403 Heights Boulevard

Houston, TX 77080

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, ) Modified on 2/15/2019 pursuant to filing error (tsher, ). (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Plaintiff Jason Doig. (Whitehead, Marc) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

10 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6528316)Attorney Marc S. Whitehead added to party Jason Doig(pty:pla), filed by Jason Doig. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehead, Marc) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/14/2019.Consent Form due by 4/17/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Standard Insurance Company by Plaintiff Jason Doig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Whitehead, Marc) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

5 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00365-NRN. (athom, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#8

(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, ) Modified on 2/15/2019 pursuant to filing error (tsher, ). (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/14/2019.Consent Form due by 4/17/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00365-NRN. (athom, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorneyMarc Whitehead. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (dbera, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Plaintiff Jason Doig. (Whitehead, Marc) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Standard Insurance Company by Plaintiff Jason Doig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Whitehead, Marc) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6528316)Attorney Marc S. Whitehead added to party Jason Doig(pty:pla), filed by Jason Doig. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehead, Marc) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less