This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2022 at 08:13:53 (UTC).

Peter W. Doerken v. AIG Property Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2022 Peter W Doerken filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AIG Property Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02145

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Peter M Doerken

Peter W Doerken

Defendants

AIG Property Casualty Company

American International Group, Inc.

AIG Private Client Group

Does 1-50, inclusive

J.S. Held, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John A Girardi

Attorney at Law Offices of John A. Girardi

29900 Hawthorne Boulevard

Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca R Weinreich

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Stephen V Kovarik

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Defendant AIG Property Casualty Company.. (Kovarik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/26/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02145 FMO(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-02145-FMO(RAOx). (ap) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#6

(#6) Defendant AIG Property Casualty Company's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AIG Property Casualty Company, identifying AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., American International Group, Inc., AIG Property Casualty Inc.. (Kovarik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (rolm) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

4 #1

CV-11C

4 #4

Main Document

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Defendant AIG Property Casualty Company.. (Kovarik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/26/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02145 FMO(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-02145-FMO(RAOx). (ap) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant AIG Property Casualty Company's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AIG Property Casualty Company, identifying AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., American International Group, Inc., AIG Property Casualty Inc.. (Kovarik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (rolm) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (rolm) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff as to defendant J.S. Held, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/28/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT 1-7 AS EXHIBIT G TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (rolm) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff as to defendant AIG Private Client Group. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/26/2021 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT 1-5 AS EXHIBIT E TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (rolm) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by defendant AIG Property Casualty Company. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT 1-3 AS EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](rolm) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants AIG Private Client Group, J.S. Held, LLC, AIG Property Casualty Company, American International Group, Inc., Does. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Peter W Doerken. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 08/03/2021 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT 1-2 AS EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (rolm) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE Statement filed by Defendant AIG Property Casualty Company (Kovarik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant AIG Property Casualty Company. (Kovarik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 21STCV28635 Receipt No: ACACDC-33048443 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Attorney Stephen V Kovarik added to party AIG Property Casualty Company(pty:dft))(Kovarik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIG Private Client Group is a litigant

Latest cases where American International Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where J.S. Held, LLC is a litigant