This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2020 at 07:48:10 (UTC).

Doe v. Williams College

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Doe filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Williams College. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine A. Robertson and Mark G. Mastroianni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-30024

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Katherine A. Robertson

Presiding Judge

Mark G. Mastroianni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe

Defendant

Williams College

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ruth K. O'Meara-Costello

David A. Russcol

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth H. Kelly

Daryl J. Lapp

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Williams College.(Kelly, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Williams College. (Kelly, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth H. Kelly on behalf of Williams College (Kelly, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl J. Lapp on behalf of Williams College (Lapp, Daryl) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. All Defendants. (Russcol, David) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Williams College. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 Assented to MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym filed by John Doe. (Russcol, David) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Assented to MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym by John Doe.(Russcol, David) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth K. O'Meara-Costello on behalf of John Doe (O'Meara-Costello, Ruth) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

1 #4

Civil Category Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8113413 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Category Form)(Russcol, David) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • Docket(#13) Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Case referred for: Full Pretrial, No Dispositive Motions (ptn). (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Williams College.(Kelly, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Williams College. (Kelly, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth H. Kelly on behalf of Williams College (Kelly, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl J. Lapp on behalf of Williams College (Lapp, Daryl) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. All Defendants. (Russcol, David) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion to Proceed Under a Pseudonym. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Williams College. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 Assented to MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym filed by John Doe. (Russcol, David) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Assented to MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym by John Doe.(Russcol, David) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth K. O'Meara-Costello on behalf of John Doe (O'Meara-Costello, Ruth) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8113413 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Category Form)(Russcol, David) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less