This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2022 at 08:49:18 (UTC).

Doe v. Whitcomb et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Doe filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Whitcomb. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark G. Mastroianni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-10356

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark G. Mastroianni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Defendants

Jennifer Whitcomb

Deerfield Academy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John J.E. Markham, II

Attorney at Markham Read Zerner LLC

One Commercial Wharf West

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant Attorney

Patricia M. Rapinchuk

Attorney at Robinson, Donovan,

1500 Main Street, Suite 2300

Springfield, MA 01115

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet 1-1 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet 1-2 Civil Category Form

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Jennifer Whitcomb served on 3/18/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. (Markham, John) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Deerfield Academy served on 3/18/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. (Markham, John) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#7

(#7) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 21, 2022 to File Answer by Deerfield Academy, Jennifer Whitcomb.(Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#8

(#8) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 21, 2022 to File Responsive Pleading or Motion to Dismiss by Deerfield Academy, Jennifer Whitcomb.(Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 21, 2022 to File Answer . (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to May 21, 2022 to File Responsive Pleading or Motion to Dismiss by Deerfield Academy, Jennifer Whitcomb. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 21, 2022 to File Responsive Pleading or Motion to Dismiss by Deerfield Academy, Jennifer Whitcomb.(Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 21, 2022 to File Answer by Deerfield Academy, Jennifer Whitcomb.(Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Deerfield Academy served on 3/18/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. (Markham, John) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Jennifer Whitcomb served on 3/18/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. (Markham, John) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield). (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9216723 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1-1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet 1-2 Civil Category Form)(Markham, John) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia M. Rapinchuk