This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2021 at 21:13:00 (UTC).

Doe v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Doe filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley A. Boone and Dale A. Drozd. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00576

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stanley A. Boone

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe

Defendants

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Tracy Renaud

Emilia Bardini

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stacy Eva Tolchin

Attorney at Law Offices of Stacy Tolchin

634 S. Spring St., Suite 500A

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Defendant Attorney

Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, Sacramento

501 I Street, Suite 10-100

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/24/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Maldonado, C) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE PSEUDONYMOUSLY AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiffs application to file pseudonymous proceedings, filed April 6, 2021 (ECF No. 3), is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall e-mail future filings that are covered by this order due to their disclosure of Plaintiffs identity or the underlying facts and claim to asylum, to ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov for filing under seal in compliance with Local Rule 141; and Plaintiffs request for a protective order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c) is GRANTED and Defendants shall continue to be bound by 8 C.F.R. 208.6(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/2021. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#11

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #3 Plaintiff's Application to Seal Declaration in Part and Requiring Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's Application to File Pseudonymous Proceedings and for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/12/2021. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/24/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Maldonado, C) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by John Doe. (Tolchin, Stacy) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE PSEUDONYMOUSLY AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiffs application to file pseudonymous proceedings, filed April 6, 2021 (ECF No. 3), is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall e-mail future filings that are covered by this order due to their disclosure of Plaintiffs identity or the underlying facts and claim to asylum, to ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov for filing under seal in compliance with Local Rule 141; and Plaintiffs request for a protective order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c) is GRANTED and Defendants shall continue to be bound by 8 C.F.R. 208.6(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/2021. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Emilia Bardini, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services to #3 Motion for Protective Order. Attorney Hemesath, Audrey Benison added. (Hemesath, Audrey) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by John Doe. Emilia Bardini served on 4/9/2021, answer due 6/8/2021; Tracy Renaud served on 4/9/2021, answer due 6/8/2021; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/9/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tolchin, Stacy) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SEALED EVENT. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by John Doe re #7 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,. (Tolchin, Stacy) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #3 Plaintiff's Application to Seal Declaration in Part and Requiring Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's Application to File Pseudonymous Proceedings and for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/12/2021. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Hemesath, Audrey) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to * Emilia Bardini, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Stacy Eva Tolchin* *Law Offices Of Stacy Tolchin* *634 S. Spring St., Suite 500A* *Los Angeles, CA 90014*. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER and to Proceed Under Pseudonym by John Doe. (Tolchin, Stacy) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by John Doe (Tolchin, Stacy) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Emilia Bardini, Tracy Renaud, USCIS by John Doe. Attorney Tolchin, Stacy Eva added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9525976) (Tolchin, Stacy) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacy Eva Tolchin