This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2021 at 09:22:54 (UTC).

Doe v. Thrasher et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Doe filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Thrasher. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Geiger Lewis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02748

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Geiger Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe

Defendants

Childs Cantey Thrasher

Donald Gist

Brian M. Barnwell

Scott E. Frick

A J Holloway

Don Jackson

Brandolyn Thomas Pinkston

Alan Wilson

Columbia, SC 29211

Byron Gipson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher P Kenney

Attorney at Richard A Harpootlian PA

1410 Laurel Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Defendant Attorneys

Meghan Lajoyce Walker

Attorney at SC State Ethics Commission

201 Executive Center Drive, Suite 150

Columbia, SC 29210

Rebecca Laffitte

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Robert E Tyson, Jr

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Vordman Carlisle Traywick

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Robert Dewayne Cook

Attorney at SC Attorney General's Office

Po Box 11549

Columbia, SC 29211

Alan Wilson

Attorney at SC Attorney General's Office

Po Box 11549

Columbia, SC 29211

James Emory Smith, Jr

Attorney at SC Attorney General's Office

Po Box 11549

Columbia, SC 29211

Robert David Garfield

Attorney at Crowe LaFave LLC

Po Box 1149

Columbia, SC 29202

Steven Richard Spreeuwers

Attorney at Crowe LaFave LLC

Po Box 1149

Columbia, SC 29202

 

Court Documents

#36

#35

#33

#31

#30

#21

#18

#12

11 #1

Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service

#11

10 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service

#10

#8

4 #2

Attachment B - Addresses

4 #1

Attachment A - Additional Defendants

#4

#3

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/18/2021. (cbru, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 11/22/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/17/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/18/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/15/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/15/2022, Discovery due by 4/18/2022, Motion in Limine due by 7/28/2022, Motions due by 5/2/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/15/2022, Bench Trial Deadline 8/18/2022, Mediation Due by 6/30/2022. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/18/2021. (cbru, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) TEXT ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff John Doe's #8 motion to proceed anonymously. No defendant opposes, at this stage in the litigation, Plaintiff's motion. See entries #18 , #21 , and #33 . The Court, after considering the relevant factors in James v. Jacobson, 6 F.3d, 233, 238 (4th Cir. 1993), as applied to this case, concludes Plaintiff's motion should be granted. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed anonymously. IT IS ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/18/2021.(cbru, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to proceed anonymously Response filed by Byron Gipson.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/22/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Garfield, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) TEXT ORDER: Defendant Byron Gipson shall file a response to Plaintiff's #8 MOTION to proceed anonymously no later than Friday, October 15, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Response to Motion due by 10/15/2021) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/12/2021. (cbru, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Byron Gipson.(Garfield, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Byron Gipson.(Garfield, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brian M. Barnwell, Scott E. Frick, Donald Gist, A J Holloway, Don Jackson, Brandolyn Thomas Pinkston, Childs Cantey Thrasher.(Traywick, Vordman) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alan Wilson.(Smith, James) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Scott E. Frick answer due 10/12/2021; Childs Cantey Thrasher answer due 10/12/2021; A J Holloway answer due 10/12/2021; Brandolyn Thomas Pinkston answer due 10/12/2021; Don Jackson answer due 10/12/2021; Donald Gist answer due 10/12/2021; Brian M. Barnwell answer due 10/12/2021. (Traywick, Vordman) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#17) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 16. Reason: Duplicate of entry #14. (cbru, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Vordman Carlisle Traywick, Rebecca Laffitte, Robert E Tyson, Jr. on behalf of Brian M. Barnwell, Scott E. Frick, Donald Gist, A J Holloway, Don Jackson, Brandolyn Thomas Pinkston, Childs Cantey Thrasher (Traywick, Vordman) Modified to edit text on 9/8/2021 (cbru, ). (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by John Doe. Brian M. Barnwell served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Scott E. Frick served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Donald Gist served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; A J Holloway served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Don Jackson served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Brandolyn Thomas Pinkston served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Childs Cantey Thrasher served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service) Refiled by the Clerk to correct event type. (cbru, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Byron Gipson served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service)(Kenney, Christopher) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Alan Wilson served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service) Refiled by the Clerk to correct event type. (cbru, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to proceed anonymously by John Doe. Response to Motion due by 9/13/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Kenney, Christopher) Modified to edit text on 8/30/2021 (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff filed this case as "John Doe vs. Childs Cantey Thrasher, et al". Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 10(a), unless Plaintiff seeks and receives permission from the Court, he cannot proceed anonymously. See James v. Jacobson, 6 F.3d 233, 238 (4th Cir. 1993). No later than September 2, 2021, Plaintiff shall either file an amended complaint in his true name or a motion to proceed anonymously. "A plaintiff seeking to proceed anonymously must show that [he or she] has a substantial privacy right that outweighs the customary and constitutionally-embedded presumption of openness in judicial proceedings." Richard S. v. Sebelius, C/A No. 3:12-cv-00007-TMC, 2012 WL 1909344, at *1 (D.S.C. May 25, 2012). Additionally, by that same date, Plaintiff shall submit an amended JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet to the Clerk's Office that includes the Plaintiff's county of residence as that document/information is restricted to Court use and is required for statistical purposes. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Amended Complaint/Motion due by 9/2/2021, JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet due by 9/2/2021) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/26/2021. (cbru, ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Brian M. Barnwell, Scott E. Frick, Byron Gipson, Donald Gist, A J Holloway, Don Jackson, Brandolyn Thomas Pinkston, Childs Cantey Thrasher, Alan Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Additional Defendants, #2 Attachment B - Addresses)(cbru, ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Doe.(cbru, ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Brian M. Barnwell, Scott E. Frick, Byron Gipson, Donald Gist, A J Holloway, Don Jackson, Brandolyn Thomas Pinkston, Childs Cantey Thrasher, Alan Wilson (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-10038429) filed by John Doe. Service due by 11/23/2021(cbru, ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E Tyson, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven R. Spreeuwers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert David Garfield

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Wilson