Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/22/2021 at 13:32:37 (UTC).

Doe v. The University of Texas M.D. Anderson Cancer Center et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Doe filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against The University of Texas M D Anderson Cancer Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01356

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe

Defendants

Karen Reed

Sheri Wakefield

Margaret McNeese

The University of Texas M.D. Anderson Cancer Center

Deana Moylan

The University of Texas at Houston Police Department

Vicki King

Kimberly Miller

Michael Redwine

Tiffany Obeng

Yolan Campbell

The University of Texas Health Science Center At Houston

all other affiliated Jake/Jane Does

Patricia J Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Michael Krenek

Attorney at Krenek Law Offices

21555 Provincial Blvd

Katy, TX 77450

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey E Farrell

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

Po Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference reset for 9/15/2021 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Doe, filed.(Krenek, Edward) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Yolan Campbell, Vicki King, Margaret McNeese, Kimberly Miller, Deana Moylan, Tiffany Obeng, Michael Redwine, Karen Reed, The University of Texas Health Science Center At Houston, The University of Texas M.D. Anderson Cancer Center, The University of Texas at Houston Police Department, Sheri Wakefield, filed.(Farrell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

1 #8

List of Counsel of Record

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

List of Documents Filed

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th Judicial District Court, Harris County, case number 2021-11519 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26331831) filed by Tiffany Obeng, Karen Reed, The University of Texas Health Science Center At Houston, Michael Redwine, Sheri Wakefield, The University of Texas M.D. Anderson Cancer Center, Vicki King, Deana Moylan, The University of Texas at Houston Police Department, Yolan Campbell, Kimberly Miller, Margaret McNeese. (Attachments: #1 List of Documents Filed, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 List of Counsel of Record)(Farrell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference reset for 9/15/2021 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Doe, filed.(Krenek, Edward) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Yolan Campbell, Vicki King, Margaret McNeese, Kimberly Miller, Deana Moylan, Tiffany Obeng, Michael Redwine, Karen Reed, The University of Texas Health Science Center At Houston, The University of Texas M.D. Anderson Cancer Center, The University of Texas at Houston Police Department, Sheri Wakefield, filed.(Farrell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th Judicial District Court, Harris County, case number 2021-11519 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26331831) filed by Tiffany Obeng, Karen Reed, The University of Texas Health Science Center At Houston, Michael Redwine, Sheri Wakefield, The University of Texas M.D. Anderson Cancer Center, Vicki King, Deana Moylan, The University of Texas at Houston Police Department, Yolan Campbell, Kimberly Miller, Margaret McNeese. (Attachments: #1 List of Documents Filed, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 List of Counsel of Record)(Farrell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT HOUSTON (THE) is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS MD ANDERSON CANCER CENTER is a litigant