This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2021 at 08:08:18 (UTC).

Doe v. The University of Michigan et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Doe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The University of Michigan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Denise Page Hood, Kimberly G. Altman, Victoria A. Roberts and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-12500

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Denise Page Hood

Victoria A. Roberts

Referral Judges

Kimberly G. Altman

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John R.S. Doe

Defendants

The University of Michigan

The Regents of the University of Michigan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Deborah L. Gordon

Attorney at Deborah L. Gordon Assoc.

33 Bloomfield Hills Parkway, Suite 220

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor

Attorney at Deborah Gordon Law

33 Bloomfield Hills Parway, Suite 220

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Molly Savage

Attorney at Deborah Gordon Law

33 Bloomfield Pkwy, Suite 220

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Sarah Gordon Thomas

Attorney at Deborah Gordon Law

33 Bloomfield Hills Parkway, Suite 220

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Exhibit A - Protective Order Concerning the use of Pseudonym John R.S. Doe

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Denise Page Hood and Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman to District Judge Victoria A. Roberts and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#6

(#6) PROTECTIVE ORDER #4 Concerning the Use of Pseudonym John R.S. Doe. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor on behalf of John R.S. Doe. (Taylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Gordon Thomas on behalf of John R.S. Doe. (Thomas, Sarah) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Savage on behalf of John R.S. Doe. (Savage, Molly) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. The University of Michigan waiver sent on 12/2/2021, answer due 1/31/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. The Regents of the University of Michigan waiver sent on 12/2/2021, answer due 1/31/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. The Regents of the University of Michigan waiver sent on 12/2/2021, answer due 1/31/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. The University of Michigan waiver sent on 12/2/2021, answer due 1/31/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Savage on behalf of John R.S. Doe. (Savage, Molly) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Gordon Thomas on behalf of John R.S. Doe. (Thomas, Sarah) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor on behalf of John R.S. Doe. (Taylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROTECTIVE ORDER #4 Concerning the Use of Pseudonym John R.S. Doe. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Denise Page Hood and Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman to District Judge Victoria A. Roberts and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Ex Parte MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM by John R.S. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order Concerning the use of Pseudonym John R.S. Doe) (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *The University of Michigan* (SKra) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *The Regents of the University of Michigan* (SKra) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by John R.S. Doe against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8665963 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court, Southern Division, 2:20-cv-10568-VAR-EAS, Judge Victoria A. Roberts] (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The University of Michigan is a litigant

Latest cases where The Regents Of The University Of Michigan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Molly Savage