This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/28/2020 at 09:04:08 (UTC).

DOE v. THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 DOE filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Doris L. Pryor, James R. Sweeney II and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02006

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judges

Doris L. Pryor

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN DOE

Defendants

IU KELLEY SCHOOL OF BUSINESS

INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE

IUPUI

JAY L. HESS

GREGORY KUESTER

THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY

BRADLEY ALLEN

JAY HESS

INDIANA UNIVERSITY KELLEY SCHOOL OF BUSINESS

INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY INDIANAPOLIS, INDIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael T. McNally

Attorney at DELK MCNALLY

3815 River Crossing Parkway, Suite 100

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Tara J. Davis

Attorney at NESENOFF & MILTENBERG, LLP

101 Federal Street, 19Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Andrew T. Miltenberg

Attorney at NESENOFF & MILTENBERG, LLP

363 Seventh Avenue, Fifth Floor

New York, NY 10001

Stuart Bernstein

Attorney at NESENOFF & MILTENBERG, LLP

363 Seventh Avenue, Fifth Floor

New York, NY 10001

Regina M. Federico

Attorney at NESENOFF & MILTENBERG, LLP

101 Federal Street, 19Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant Attorneys

Alice McKenzie Morical

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

Jan P. Mensz

Attorney at ACLU OF INDIANA

1031 E. Washington St.

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Wayne C. Turner

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

Kathleen Anne Watson

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

#33

27 #2

Envelope

27 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#27

26 #2

Envelope

26 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#26

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

Proposed Summons Multiple Defendants

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg for JOHN DOE added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Andrew T. Miltenberg is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to Andrew T. Miltenberg via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/25/2020. (SWM) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Jan P. Mensz hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Mensz, Jan) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Stuart Bernstein for JOHN DOE added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Stuart Bernstein is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to Stuart Bernstein via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/25/2020. (SWM) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2020 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional deadlines). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/25/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting Defendants' #24 Motion for Extension of Time - Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint within ten days of the Court's ruling on Defendants' partial motion to dismiss [Dkt. #28 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/25/2020. (SWM) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Kathleen Watson on behalf of All Defendants (Watson, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) , filed by Defendants BRADLEY ALLEN, JAY HESS, INDIANA UNIVERSITY KELLEY SCHOOL OF BUSINESS, INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY INDIANAPOLIS, INDIANA, INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, GREGORY KUESTER, THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Morical, Alice) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Dismiss (Partial), filed by Defendants BRADLEY ALLEN, JAY HESS, INDIANA UNIVERSITY KELLEY SCHOOL OF BUSINESS, INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY INDIANAPOLIS, INDIANA, INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, GREGORY KUESTER, THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morical, Alice) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew T. Miltenberg to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP070915). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(JDC) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Attorney(s) Stuart Bernstein to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP070915). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(JDC) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER - Plaintiff moves to proceed anonymously in this case, under the pseudonym "John Doe," by which he has filed his complaint and all subsequent documents. Plaintiff further references "Jane Roe" but has failed to disclose her identity to the Court. Although Defendants are aware of Plaintiff's actual name and his references to Jane Roe, the Court must independently determine whether the standard for anonymous litigation is satisfied. Accordingly, and for completeness of the record, on or before August 13, 2020, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file, under seal, a disclosure statement providing his true name, as well as the true name of "Jane Roe". By way of this Order, the Court hereby authorizes Plaintiff to file the statement under seal. Plaintiff is not required to file a motion to seal; rather, Plaintiff need only file a cover sheet citing to this Order pursuant to S.D. Ind. L.R. 5-11(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/7/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Ex Parte Motion with supporting documents for all defendants served on Wayne Turner, Esq. on 08/06/2020, filed by JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS delivery receipt)(McNally, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOHN DOE.(McNally, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-02006-JRS-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (AKH) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/31/2020. (CAG) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to BRADLEY ALLEN, JAY HESS, INDIANA UNIVERSITY KELLEY SCHOOL OF BUSINESS, INDIANA UNIVERSITY PURDUE UNIVERSITY INDIANAPOLIS, INDIANA, INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, GREGORY KUESTER, THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (AKH) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. McNally on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN DOE. (McNally, Michael) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOHN DOE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6106896) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Multiple Defendants)(McNally, Michael) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael T. McNally

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stuart Bernstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Miltenberg