This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2022 at 07:20:23 (UTC).

DOE v. Rhodes College et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 DOE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Rhodes College. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and John T. Fowlkes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02811

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

John T. Fowlkes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANE DOE

Defendants

Rhodes College

David Caddle

Amaka MgBoh

Richard Adams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob Webster Brown

Attorney at APPERSON CRUMP, PIC

6000 Poplar Avenue, Suite 150

Memphis, TN 38119

Bruce S. Kramer

Attorney at APPERSON CRUMP PLC

6000 Poplar Avenue, Suite 150

Memphis, TN 38119

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa A. Krupicka

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Lani D. Lester

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Sarah Elizabeth Stuart

Attorney at BURCH, PORTER & JOHNSON

130 North Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

35 #4

Exhibit Ex. 2 to Foreman Decl.

35 #3

Exhibit Ex. 1 to Foreman Decl.

35 #2

Affidavit Decl. Kendall Foreman

35 #1

Exhibit Ex. A to Pl.'s Post-Hr'g Br.

35 #35

Main Document

#33

(#33) RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental, Post-Hearing Brief, not to Exceed Six Pages, proposed order submitted filed by Rhodes College. (Stuart, Sarah) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#32

(#32) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental, Post-Hearing Brief, not to Exceed Six Pages, proposed order submitted by JANE DOE. (Brown, Jacob) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

20 #1

Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion for Injunctive Relief

20 #20

Main Document

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Rhodes College. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#2

(#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

1 #6

Exhibit Ex Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Request f

1 #5

Exhibit Ex 3 Nov 26 Formal Outcome Ltr

1 #4

Exhibit Ex 2 Hearing and Appeals Procedure

1 #3

Exhibit Ex 1 Nov 15 Email from Caddle re Charges

1 #2

Summons Summons Rhodes College

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Proposed Order Submitted filed by JANE DOE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Pl.'s Post-Hr'g Br., #2 Affidavit Decl. Kendall Foreman, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Foreman Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Foreman Decl.)(Brown, Jacob) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] granting #32 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Post-Hearing Brief signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 2/18/2022. (Fowlkes, J.) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental, Post-Hearing Brief, not to Exceed Six Pages, proposed order submitted filed by Rhodes College. (Stuart, Sarah) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental, Post-Hearing Brief, not to Exceed Six Pages, proposed order submitted by JANE DOE. (Brown, Jacob) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Exhibit List by JANE DOE. (wrh) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket(#30) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Injunction Hearing held on 2/15/2022. Counsel for Plaintiff, Bruce S. Kramer & Jacob W. Brown; Defense counsel Lisa A. Krupicka, Sarah Elizabeth Stuart, Lani D. Lester present in court. The Court addressed de# 8 Motion to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed Under Pseudonym Jane Doe heard & Denied by the Court, written order to follow later. Plaintiff will file an Amended Complaint substituting Plaintiff's given name Kendall Foreman. Injunction Hearing heard; Plaintiff's proof/witnesses: Kendall Foreman, Exh's #1-#8. Hearing heard & taken under advisement, order to be entered.(Plaintiff: Bruce S. Kramer & Jacob W. Brown)(Defense: Lisa A. Krupicka, Sarah Elizabeth Stuart, Lani D. Lester) (Court Reporter Tina Gibson.) (wrh) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • Docket(#29) SETTING LETTER: [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] TRO / Motion Hearing (de# 8) ADVANCED IN TIME ONLY for Tuesday, 2/15/2022 AT 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. (wrh) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Sealed Document Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Facts. (Brown, Jacob) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Proposed Order Submitted Rhodes College's Sealed Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rhodes College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration of Alicia Golston with Exhibits, #3 Declaration of David Caddle with Exhibits)(Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Lani D. Lester on behalf of All Defendants (Lester, Lani) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SETTING LETTER: Re: #8 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER HEARING & SEALED MOTION to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 1/5/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. (wrh) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #8 SEALED MOTION to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by JANE DOE has been filed. For future reference, please note : Filer failed to indicate in docket text "Proposed Order Submitted" as required by local rules. If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SEALED MOTION to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed Under Pseudonym by JANE DOE. (Kramer, Bruce) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, OF BRUCE S. KRAMER by JANE DOE. (Kramer, Bruce) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Rhodes College. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3776920), filed by JANE DOE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Rhodes College, #3 Exhibit Ex 1 Nov 15 Email from Caddle re Charges, #4 Exhibit Ex 2 Hearing and Appeals Procedure, #5 Exhibit Ex 3 Nov 26 Formal Outcome Ltr, #6 Exhibit Ex Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Request for TRO)(Kramer, Bruce) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa A. Krupicka

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Elizabeth Stuart

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lani D. Lester