This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2021 at 17:44:13 (UTC).

Doe v. RHOC Inc

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Doe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RHOC Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gray M Borden and R David Proctor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00308

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Gray M Borden

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe

Defendant

RHOC Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey C Kirby

Attorney at KIRBY JOHNSON, PC

One Independence Plaza Drive, Suite 520

Birmingham, AL 35209

Chandler Osborn Kirby

Attorney at KIRBY JOHNSON PC

One Independence Plaza, Ste. 520

Birmingham, AL 35209

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher H Jones

Attorney at TRADITIONS LAW GROUP

1302 Main Ave.

Northport, AL 35476

C Peter Bolvig, III

Attorney at Whitaker Mudd Luke & Wells

2011 Fourth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#21

#19

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SCHEDULING ORDER: certain time limits apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 8/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2022. Mediation in September 2022; Pretrial conference ready in January 2023; Jury trial ready in February 2023. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/8/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Scheduling Conference held on 6/8/2021. A separate Scheduling Order will be entered by the court. (KLL) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2021 03:00 PM before Judge R David Proctor. The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant are DIRECTED to dial-in to the conference by calling 866-434-5269 at the scheduled time. The access code is 6022965. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/3/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) INITIAL ORDER - Unless expressly directed otherwise, the parties SHALL comply with all provisions of this Initial Order in the litigation of this action. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/25/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kirby, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case; the telephone conference set for 5/19/2021 is cancelled. (KAM) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled at 10:00 AM on Wednesday, May 19, 2021; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be cancelled (ASL) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by RHOC Inc. (Bolvig, C) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are ORDERED to file their Rule 26 Report on or before May 19, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 05/05/2021. (SUH) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to conduct Rule 26(f) Confernce by John Doe. (Kirby, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant, RHOC, Inc. by John Doe. (Kirby, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/8/2021 (KAM, ). (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Chandler Osborn Kirby on behalf of John Doe (Kirby, Chandler) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER on or before April 16, 2021, Plaintiff shall show cause, if any exists, as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 4/7/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. RHOC Inc served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion to proceed anonymously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 3/2/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to RHOC Inc. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by John Doe. (MEB2) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3786689. related document #1 COMPLAINT against RHOC Inc, filed by John Doe.(KEK). (Kirby, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY by John Doe. (KEK) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against RHOC Inc, filed by John Doe.(KEK) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chandler Osborn Kirby(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey C Kirby(Designation Retained)