This case was last updated from PACER on 01/21/2020 at 09:27:29 (UTC).

Doe v. Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Doe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Norman K. Moon and Joel C. Hoppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00070

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Norman K. Moon

Referral Judge

Joel C. Hoppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Defendants

Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia

Chris Ghaemmaghami

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Edward Fogel

Attorney at JEFFREY E. FOGEL LAW OFFICE

913 E. Jefferson Street

Charlottesville, VA 22902

Defendant Attorneys

Blaire Hawkins O'Brien

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Richmond

202 North Ninth Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Marshall H. Ross

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) PRETRIAL ORDER, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/2/20. (hnw)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Chris Ghaemmaghami, Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia.(O'Brien, Blaire)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Blaire Hawkins O'Brien on behalf of Chris Ghaemmaghami, Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia (O'Brien, Blaire)

11 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia (Ross, Marshall)

#9

(#9) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chris Ghaemmaghami (Ross, Marshall)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall H. Ross on behalf of All Defendants (Ross, Marshall)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 12/13/19. (hnw)

#6

(#6) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 First MOTION for Protective Order and to proceed annonymously as Jane Doe . filed by Jane Doe. (Fogel, Jeffrey)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) First MOTION for Protective Order and to proceed annonymously as Jane Doe by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fogel, Jeffrey)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons by Jane Doe as to Chris Ghaemmaghami.(Fogel, Jeffrey)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)

1 #1

Criminal Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Chris Ghaemmaghami, Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt no. 0423-3276360.), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Criminal Cover Sheet)(hnw)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • (#17) Notice Rescheduling Hearing (N) previously set for 1/24/20 at 1:30 PM before Judge Hoppe Scheduling Conference Call RESET for 1/24/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email counsel dial in information.(kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • (#16) NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Scheduling Conference Call set for 1/24/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email counsel dial in information.(kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) PRETRIAL ORDER, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/2/20. (hnw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORAL ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint parties having filed answer within originally allotted time to file a responsive pleading. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/2/20. (hnw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Chris Ghaemmaghami, Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia.(O'Brien, Blaire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Blaire Hawkins O'Brien on behalf of Chris Ghaemmaghami, Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia (O'Brien, Blaire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Consent Motion by Chris Ghaemmaghami, Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Ross, Marshall)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia (Ross, Marshall)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chris Ghaemmaghami (Ross, Marshall)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall H. Ross on behalf of All Defendants (Ross, Marshall)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 12/13/19. (hnw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 First MOTION for Protective Order and to proceed annonymously as Jane Doe . filed by Jane Doe. (Fogel, Jeffrey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION for Protective Order and to proceed annonymously as Jane Doe by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fogel, Jeffrey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Chris Ghaemmaghami NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons by Jane Doe as to Chris Ghaemmaghami.(Fogel, Jeffrey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Chris Ghaemmaghami, Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt no. 0423-3276360.), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Criminal Cover Sheet)(hnw)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey E. Fogel