This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2021 at 15:41:54 (UTC).

Doe v. Northwestern University

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Doe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Northwestern University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan H. Lefkow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01579

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan H. Lefkow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Defendant

Northwestern University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mary C. Turke

Attorney at Turke & Strauss LLP

613 Williamson St., Suite 201

Madison, WI 53703

Samuel J. Strauss

Attorney at Turke & Strauss LLP

613 Williamson St., Suite 201

Madison, WI 53703

Jonathan Patrick Misny

Attorney at Murray Murphy Moul Basil Llp

1114 Dublin Road

Columbus, OH 43215

Anthony Paronich

Attorney at Paronich Law, P.C.

350 Lincoln Street, Suite 2400

Hingham, MA 02043

Brian Kevin Murphy

Attorney at Murray Murphy Moul Basil LLP

1114 Dublin Road

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant Attorneys

Elena Marie Olivieri

Attorney at Jenner & Block, Llp

353 N. Clark St.

Chicago, IL 60654

David Charles Layden

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Reid J Schar

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654-3456

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MEMORANDUM by Jane Doe in Opposition to motion to dismiss #15 (Murphy, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#20

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion for extension of time #19 is granted. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #15 is extended to be due by 6/14/2021; defendant's reply by 7/6/2021. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#19

(#19) MOTION by Plaintiff Jane Doe for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss #15 , memorandum in support of motion #16 Agreed Motion (Murphy, Brian) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#18

(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Anthony Paronich (Paronich, Anthony) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

16 #3

Exhibit 3

16 #2

Exhibit 2

16 #1

Exhibit 1

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM by Northwestern University in support of motion to dismiss #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Layden, David) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#15

(#15) MOTION by Defendant Northwestern University to dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Layden, David) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Brian Kevin Murphy (Murphy, Brian) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#6

(#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to Brian K. Murphy (daj, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northwestern University by Elena Marie Olivieri (Olivieri, Elena) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northwestern University by Reid J Schar (Schar, Reid) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northwestern University by David Charles Layden (Layden, David) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Layden, David) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from The Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2021-CH-00404) filed by Northwestern University Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18046015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Layden, David) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEMORANDUM by Jane Doe in Opposition to motion to dismiss #15 (Murphy, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion for extension of time #19 is granted. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #15 is extended to be due by 6/14/2021; defendant's reply by 7/6/2021. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION by Plaintiff Jane Doe for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss #15 , memorandum in support of motion #16 Agreed Motion (Murphy, Brian) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Anthony Paronich (Paronich, Anthony) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #15 is due by 5/17/2021; defendant's reply by 6/1/2021. The status hearing set for 5/4/2021 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM by Northwestern University in support of motion to dismiss #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Layden, David) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION by Defendant Northwestern University to dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Layden, David) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Attorney Samuel J. Strauss is added as counsel for plaintiff. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18068858. (Strauss, Samuel) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Mary C. Turke (Turke, Mary) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 5/4/2021 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Jonathan Patrick Misny (Misny, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Brian Kevin Murphy (Murphy, Brian) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to Brian K. Murphy (daj, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northwestern University by Elena Marie Olivieri (Olivieri, Elena) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northwestern University by Reid J Schar (Schar, Reid) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northwestern University by David Charles Layden (Layden, David) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Layden, David) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from The Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2021-CH-00404) filed by Northwestern University Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18046015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Layden, David) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Northwestern University is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Charles Layden

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reid Joshua Schar