This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2020 at 11:11:14 (UTC).

Doe v. Esper et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 Doe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Esper. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is F. Dennis Saylor, IV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10530

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

F. Dennis Saylor, IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Defendants

Honorable Mark T. Esper

Secretary Thomas B. Modly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel J. Ball

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Stephanie Schuster

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Shannon Minter

Attorney at National Center for Lesbian Rights

Suite 370, 870 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Jennifer L. Levi

Attorney at Gay & Lesbian Advocates & Defenders

18 Tremont Street, Suite 950

Boston, MA 02108

Susan B. Manning

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Matthew Sharbaugh

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Susan Baker Manning

Attorney at Morgan , Lewis, Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Matthew C. McDonough

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant Attorneys

James R. Powers

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Division

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Andrew E. Carmichael

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

1100 L St. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#34

32 #10

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

32 #9

Affidavit Wilmoth Affidavit

32 #8

Affidavit Mabus Affidavit

32 #7

Affidavit Carson Affidavit

32 #6

Affidavit Brown Affidavit

32 #5

Affidavit Doe Affidavit

32 #4

Exhibit Manning Exhibits 29-42

32 #1

Affidavit Manning Affidavit

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Affidavit

4 #2

Exhibit

4 #1

Affidavit

#4

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet

#1

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Notice of Service of Process filed by Jane Doe. Individual(s)/Entities served: Attorney General of the United States; Secretary of Defense of the United States; Secretary of the Navy of the United States. (Ball, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Leave to File Permitted) filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Manning Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Manning Exhibits 1-10, #3 Exhibit Manning Exhibits 11-28, #4 Exhibit Manning Exhibits 29-42, #5 Affidavit Doe Affidavit, #6 Affidavit Brown Affidavit, #7 Affidavit Carson Affidavit, #8 Affidavit Mabus Affidavit, #9 Affidavit Wilmoth Affidavit, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ball, Daniel) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered granting #28 Motion.Defendants' consolidated response to Plaintiff's Motion for PI due by 5/18/2020; Plaintiff's reply/response due by 6/8/2020; Defendants' response(s) due by 6/22/2020. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting #15 Motion ; granting #17 Motion to Seal (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Powers on behalf of Mark T. Esper, Thomas B. Modly (Powers, James) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Joint MOTION Set a Briefing Schedule and Extend Page Limits for Defendants' Consolidated Briefing by Mark T. Esper, Thomas B. Modly. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Carmichael on behalf of Mark T. Esper, Thomas B. Modly (Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE by Jane Doe re #17 MOTION to Seal Version of Complaint Identifying Plaintiff, #15 MOTION Proceed Under Pseudonym and Entry of Protective Order , #14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Ball, Daniel) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Notice of Service of Process filed by Jane Doe., SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Jane Doe. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Summons_Esper, #2 Exhibit Executed Summons_Modly)(Ball, Daniel) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Minter on behalf of Jane Doe (Minter, Shannon) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Ball on behalf of Jane Doe (Ball, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Ball on behalf of Jane Doe (Ball, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Ball on behalf of Jane Doe (Ball, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Stephanie Schuster Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8158520 by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Ball, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Shannon Minter Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8158485 by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Ball, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Susan Baker Manning Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8158467 by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Ball, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew Sharbaugh Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8158444 by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Ball, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Mark T. Esper, Thomas B. Modly. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT LT Jane Doe against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8158376 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Action Category Sheet)(Ball, Daniel) Modified docket text on 3/17/2020 (Pacho, Arnold). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Evan Carmichael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James R. Powers