This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:33:16 (UTC).

Doe v. Michigan State University et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Doe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michigan State University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00226

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe

Defendants

Robert Kent

Rick Schafer

Michigan State University

Aron Sousa, MD

Aron Sousa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keeley Danielle Blanchard

Attorney at Blanchard Law

309 S Lafayette St., Ste. 208, P.O. Box 938

Greenville, MI 48838

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Mark Schwartz

Attorney at Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone PLC (Detroit)

150 W Jefferson Ave., Ste. 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-4415

Scott Robert Eldridge

Attorney at Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone PLC (Lansing)

One Michigan Ave., Ste. 900

Lansing, MI 48933

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding amendment to complaint; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#30

(#30) PROPOSED STIPULATED ORDER regarding Amendment to Complaint by defendants Robert Kent, Michigan State University, Rick Schafer, Aron Sousa (Schwartz, Brian) Modified text on 5/28/2019 (jlg) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#29

(#29) ORDER granting #25 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

25 #5

Exhibit 4

25 #4

Exhibit 3

25 #3

Exhibit 2

25 #2

Exhibit 1

25 #1

Index of Exhibits

#25

(#25) EMERGENCY MOTION to amend/correct #23 Dates Set Forth in the Court's April 15, 2019 Opinion and Order by defendants Robert Kent, Michigan State University, Rick Schafer, Aron Sousa; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Eldridge, Scott) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for protective order permitting Plaintiff to proceed anonymously #2 filed by John Doe (Blanchard, Keeley) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#3

(#3) BRIEF in support of MOTION for protective order permitting Plaintiff to proceed anonymously #2 filed by John Doe (Blanchard, Keeley) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#4) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for protective order permitting Plaintiff to proceed anonymously #2 filed by John Doe (Blanchard, Keeley) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

1 #4

Summons Aron Sousa, MD

1 #3

Summons Rick Schafer

1 #2

Summons Robert Kent

1 #1

Summons Michigan State University

#1

FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff John Doe in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4396663 (Blanchard, Keeley) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding amendment to complaint; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) PROPOSED STIPULATED ORDER regarding Amendment to Complaint by defendants Robert Kent, Michigan State University, Rick Schafer, Aron Sousa (Schwartz, Brian) Modified text on 5/28/2019 (jlg) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER granting #25 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) RESPONSE in opposition to EMERGENCY MOTION to amend/correct #23 Dates Set Forth in the Court's April 15, 2019 Opinion and Order #25 filed by John Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - RVSMP) (Blanchard, Keeley) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER; Plaintiff's response shall be filed no later than 12:00 noon on 4/26/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re EMERGENCY MOTION to amend/correct #23 Dates Set Forth in the Court's April 15, 2019 Opinion and Order #25 filed by Robert Kent, Michigan State University, Rick Schafer, Aron Sousa (Eldridge, Scott) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) EMERGENCY MOTION to amend/correct #23 Dates Set Forth in the Court's April 15, 2019 Opinion and Order by defendants Robert Kent, Michigan State University, Rick Schafer, Aron Sousa; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Eldridge, Scott) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) TRANSCRIPT of the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction held April 11, 2019, before the Honorable Paul L. Maloney; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 7/23/2019 ; redaction request due 5/15/2019 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: K. Thomas, (269) 385-3050) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) OPINION AND ORDER denying #7 motion for TRO; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MINUTES of motion hearing re #7 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by John Doe; motion denied, order to issue; schedule established for Baum hearing; held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Court Reporter: Kathleen Thomas) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction by plaintiff John Doe; (Blanchard, Keeley) Modified text per request of Chambers on 3/28/2019 (ems). (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Robert Kent, Michigan State University, Rick Schafer, Aron Sousa (ems) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott Robert Eldridge on behalf of defendants Robert Kent, Michigan State University, Rick Schafer, Aron Sousa, MD (Eldridge, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brian Mark Schwartz on behalf of defendants Robert Kent, Michigan State University, Rick Schafer, Aron Sousa, MD (Schwartz, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for protective order permitting Plaintiff to proceed anonymously #2 filed by John Doe (Blanchard, Keeley) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEF in support of MOTION for protective order permitting Plaintiff to proceed anonymously #2 filed by John Doe (Blanchard, Keeley) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for protective order permitting Plaintiff to proceed anonymously by plaintiff John Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Blanchard, Keeley) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff John Doe in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4396663 (Blanchard, Keeley) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by John Doe (Attachments: #1 Summons Michigan State University, #2 Summons Robert Kent, #3 Summons Rick Schafer, #4 Summons Aron Sousa, MD) (Blanchard, Keeley) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less