This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 07:59:42 (UTC).

DOE v. LATEEF et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LATEEF. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01594

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANE DOE

Defendants

AMITY SERENITY PINES PERSONAL CARE HOME, LLC

SERENITY PERSONAL CARE HOME

MATTHEW BECK

LA FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC

KENNY MARTINE

SERENITY CARE, INC.

JOELLE HOLLIS

KELLEY HOLLIS-OLIVER

MUJAHED "BUD" LATEEF, IV

EDDIE SWEET GAINES

KENNY MARTIN

AMITY SERENITY PINES REAL ESTATE LLC,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven M. Barth

Attorney at Barth & Associates

P.O. Box 23627

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Jonathan M. Gesk

Attorney at Gesk Moritz, LLC

14 East Main Street

Carnegie, PA 15106

Defendant Attorneys

John C. McMeekin, II

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson LLP

1339 Chestnut Street, 16Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Grant H. Hackley

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson LLP

Henry W. Oliver Bldg., Suite 1000, 535 Smithfield Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Edward J. Chiodo

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson LLP

Henry W. Oliver Bldg., 535 Smithfiled Street Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

7 #10

Summons as to SERENITY PERSONAL CARE HOME (Roessler Road)

7 #9

Summons as to SERENITY PERSONAL CARE HOME (Jones Drive)

7 #8

Summons as to SERENITY CARE, INC. (Roessler Road)

7 #7

Summons as to MUJAHED "BUD" LATEEF, IV

7 #6

Summons as to MATTHEW BECK

7 #5

Summons as to KENNY MARTIN

7 #4

Summons as to KELLEY HOLLIS-OLIVER

7 #3

Summons as to JOELLE HOLLIS

7 #2

Summons as to EDDIE SWEET GAINES

7 #1

Summons as to AMITY SERENITY PINES REAL ESTATE LLC,

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to AMITY SERENITY PINES PERSONAL CARE HOME, LLC, MATTHEW BECK, EDDIE SWEET GAINES, JOELLE HOLLIS, KELLEY HOLLIS-OLIVER, LA FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, MUJAHED "BUD" LATEEF, IV, KENNY MARTINE, SERENITY CARE, INC., SERENITY PERSONAL CARE HOME (Main Document is issued as to Amity Serenity Pines Care Home LLC) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to AMITY SERENITY PINES REAL ESTATE LLC,, #2 Summons Issued as to EDDIE SWEET GAINES, #3 Summons Issued as to JOELLE HOLLIS, #4 Summons Issued as to KELLEY HOLLIS-OLIVER, #5 Summons Issued as to KENNY MARTIN, #6 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW BECK, #7 Summons Issued as to MUJAHED "BUD" LATEEF, IV, #8 Summons Issued as to SERENITY CARE, INC. (Roessler Road), #9 Summons as to SERENITY PERSONAL CARE HOME (Jones Drive), #10 Summons as to SERENITY PERSONAL CARE HOME (Roessler Road)) (jv) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

6 #11

Exhibit 11

6 #10

Exhibit 10

6 #9

Exhibit 9

6 #8

Exhibit 8

6 #3

Exhibit 3

6 #2

Exhibit 2

#6

(#6) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JANE DOE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11) (Gesk, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to AMITY SERENITY PINES PERSONAL CARE HOME, LLC, MATTHEW BECK, EDDIE SWEET GAINES, JOELLE HOLLIS, KELLEY HOLLIS-OLIVER, LA FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, MUJAHED "BUD" LATEEF, IV, KENNY MARTINE, SERENITY CARE, INC., SERENITY PERSONAL CARE HOME (Main Document is issued as to Amity Serenity Pines Care Home LLC) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to AMITY SERENITY PINES REAL ESTATE LLC,, #2 Summons Issued as to EDDIE SWEET GAINES, #3 Summons Issued as to JOELLE HOLLIS, #4 Summons Issued as to KELLEY HOLLIS-OLIVER, #5 Summons Issued as to KENNY MARTIN, #6 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW BECK, #7 Summons Issued as to MUJAHED "BUD" LATEEF, IV, #8 Summons Issued as to SERENITY CARE, INC. (Roessler Road), #9 Summons as to SERENITY PERSONAL CARE HOME (Jones Drive), #10 Summons as to SERENITY PERSONAL CARE HOME (Roessler Road)) (jv) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JANE DOE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11) (Gesk, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement identifying LAF,Inc., Seidler Fitness Holdings II, LP, The Seidler Company, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LA FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (McMeekin, John) Modified text on 1/9/2020. (ept) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Grant H. Hackley on behalf of LA FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Hackley, Grant) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Chiodo on behalf of LA FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Chiodo, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 12/26/2019. (cjo) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Gesk on behalf of JANE DOE. (Gesk, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-016855 Copies attached: Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A- State Court Complaint and Exhibit B (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5390432), filed by LA FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B) (cjo) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.