This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:26:00 (UTC).

Doe v. Jet Blue Airways Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Doe filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Jet Blue Airways Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy Kuo and Rachel P. Kovner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00101

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

Presiding Judge

Rachel P. Kovner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Defendants

Steven Tenorio

Jet Blue Airways Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abraham Zev Wolf Melamed

Attorney at Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC

1 Penn Plaza, Suite 4905

New York, NY 10119

Defendant Attorneys

Samantha K. Abeysekera

Attorney at Akerman LLP

666 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10103

Raymond Joseph Berti

Attorney at Akerman LLP

666 Fifth Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10103

Matthew Adam Steinberg

Attorney at Akerman LLP

666 Fifth Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10103

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Steven summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Steven summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jet Blue Airways Corporation (Abeysekera, Samantha) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe (Melamed, Abraham) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Joseph Berti on behalf of Jet Blue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Berti, Raymond) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#11

(#11) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of a motion to strike or dismiss by Jet Blue Airways Corporation. (Abeysekera, Samantha) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha K. Abeysekera on behalf of Jet Blue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Abeysekera, Samantha) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on April 7, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that defendants are aware of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/14/2020. (Riquelme, Claudia) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jet Blue Airways Corporation, Steven Tenorio filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12221674 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Melamed, Abraham) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Adam Steinberg on behalf of Jet Blue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Steinberg, Matthew) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of a motion to strike or dismiss by Jet Blue Airways Corporation. (Abeysekera, Samantha) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jet Blue Airways Corporation (Abeysekera, Samantha) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Joseph Berti on behalf of Jet Blue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Berti, Raymond) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Adam Steinberg on behalf of Jet Blue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Steinberg, Matthew) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha K. Abeysekera on behalf of Jet Blue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Abeysekera, Samantha) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Judge Ann M Donnelly no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on April 7, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that defendants are aware of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/14/2020. (Riquelme, Claudia) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Steven summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Jane Doe (Melamed, Abraham) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jet Blue Airways Corporation, Steven Tenorio filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12221674 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Melamed, Abraham) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.